Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099047

EP1099047 - EXHAUST GAS CLEANING SYSTEM HAVING INTERNAL AMMONIA PRODUCTION FOR REDUCING NITROGEN OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / BÖGNER, Walter
Neckarhalde 24
D-71686 Remseck / DE
02 / HARTWEG, Martin
Am Wall 5
D-89155 Erbach / DE
03 / KONRAD, Brigitte
Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 14
D-89134 Blaustein / DE
04 / KRUTZSCH, Bernd
Eichendorffstrasse 8
D-73770 Denkendorf / DE
05 / WEIBEL, Michel
Bernsteinstrasse 30
D-70619 Stuttgart / DE
06 / WENNINGER, Günter
Alte Dorfstrasse 36 A
D-70599 Stuttgart / DE
 [2001/20]
Application number, filing date00920568.324.03.2000
[2001/20]
WO2000EP02623
Priority number, dateDE199912296019.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19922960
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0071868
Date:30.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099047
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099047
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/20, F01N3/28, F01N3/08, B01D53/94, B01D53/90, B01D53/32
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/39]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ABGASREINIGUNGSANLAGE MIT INTERNER AMMONIAKERZEUGUNG ZUR STICKOXIDREDUKTION[2001/20]
English:EXHAUST GAS CLEANING SYSTEM HAVING INTERNAL AMMONIA PRODUCTION FOR REDUCING NITROGEN OXIDES[2001/20]
French:INSTALLATION DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT A PRODUCTION INTERNE D'AMMONIAC POUR LA REDUCTION DES OXYDES D'AZOTES[2001/49]
Former [2001/20]INSTALLATION DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT A PRODUCTION INTERNE D'AMMONIAC POUR LA REDUCTION DES OXYDES AZOTIQUES
Entry into regional phase16.12.2000National basic fee paid 
16.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2002Fee for grant paid
11.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0802315  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 32 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19510804  (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 46 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3767764  (DOLBEAR G) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - line 41 * * figure . *
by applicantEP0802315
 WO9717532