Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1169121

EP1169121 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING DROPLETS FOR USE IN CAPSULE-BASED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E Ink Corporation
733 Concord Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2002/02]
Inventor(s)01 / DUTHALER, Gregg, M.
40 Dunster road
Needham, MA 02494 / US
02 / LOXLEY, Andrew, L.
6 Kingsley Street
Allston, MA 02134 / US
 [2002/14]
Former [2002/02]01 / DUTHALER, Gregg, M.
Apartment 6E, 1243 Beacon Street
Brookline, MA 02446 / US
02 / LOXLEY, Andrew, L.
6 Kingsley Street
Allston, MA 02134 / US
Representative(s)Cole, David John , et al
46 Kirkhill Gardens
West Greenlees Estate
Cambuslang
Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Cole, David John , et al
46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang
Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB
Former [2004/20]Cole, David John , et al
46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate
Cambuslang, Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB
Former [2002/02]Cole, David John
Executive Liaison Services 43 Mount Felix
Walton-on-Thames Surrey KT12 2PJ / GB
Application number, filing date00921745.606.04.2000
[2002/02]
WO2000US09090
Priority number, dateUS19990127964P06.04.1999         Original published format: US 127964 P
US1999041300906.10.1999         Original published format: US 413009
[2002/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0059625
Date:12.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1169121
Date:09.01.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000
[2002/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1169121
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01F3/08, B01F5/04, B01F11/02, B01J13/02, B01F15/02
[2012/20]
Former International [2002/02]B01J13/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/02]
TitleGerman:METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRÖPFCHEN FÜR KAPSELBASIERTE ELEKTROPHORETISCHE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN[2002/02]
English:METHODS FOR PRODUCING DROPLETS FOR USE IN CAPSULE-BASED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAYS[2002/02]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE GOUTTELETTES DESTINES A DES AFFICHEURS PAR ELECTROPHORESE ENCAPSULES[2002/02]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2001National basic fee paid 
11.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
18.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2012Fee for grant paid
14.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2007
Opposition(s)01.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.05.2009Request for further processing filed
11.05.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.05.2009Decision despatched
03.12.2007Request for further processing filed
03.12.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.12.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
08.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
15.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200304   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2003
30.04.201112   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2011
30.04.201213   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE06.04.2013
LU06.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
IE06.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
IT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
GR01.02.2013
ES11.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
ES11.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE31.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0778083  (FREUNT IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,9-11,14-22 * column 8, line 16 - column 11, line 37; figure - *;
 [X]CH563807  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-19,22 * column 3, line 51 - column 6, line 62; figure - *;
 [X]WO9903626  (AEROQUIP CORP) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,18,20,21 * page 10, line 23 - page 20, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [X]US3423489  (ARENS, ROBERT P. ET AL) [X] 20 * column 2, line 4 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-3; example - *;
 [X]US4303433  (TOROBIN, LEONARD B.) [X] 20 * column 18, line 3 - column 28, line 21; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4123206  (DANNELLY, CLARENCE C.) [X] 20 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2; example . *