Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1169038 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3513
04.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
31.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 42
24.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 5
09.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
26.04.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
13.02.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
02.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 5
25.01.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 5
24.01.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
24.01.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 5
11.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
10.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
02.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.12.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
22.12.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
15.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
07.12.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
02.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
30.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 10
28.10.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.10.2016 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
19.10.2016 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
19.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
12.10.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 5
12.10.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
12.10.2016 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
07.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
23.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.09.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
14.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
08.09.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
05.07.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
30.05.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 4
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 3
20.05.2016 Claims Appeal 1
20.05.2016 Description Appeal 3
20.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 60
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 42
19.05.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
01.04.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 5
04.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
02.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
19.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
09.02.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
09.02.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
09.02.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
20.01.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 172
23.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
20.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
20.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
20.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
20.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Opposition 4
20.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.11.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
20.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
18.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
17.11.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
17.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 5
26.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 2
26.02.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 5
25.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.02.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
05.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
11.11.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Request for correction Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 26
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
23.12.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 21
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
23.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2013 Request for documents Opposition 1
24.06.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
08.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
08.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 220
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 81
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 190
08.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
06.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.05.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
06.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 94
06.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.04.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Communication regarding a request to amend/correct the documents for grant Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Letter concerning publication issues Search / examination 4
06.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
06.11.2012 Description Search / examination 1
06.11.2012 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
05.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
05.11.2012 Description Search / examination 1
05.11.2012 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
30.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
30.10.2012 Description Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
10.08.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.07.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.06.2012 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.06.2012 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.06.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.05.2012 Description Search / examination 2
31.05.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
31.05.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
31.05.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
27.02.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.02.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 229
13.10.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
13.10.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
19.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.06.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.01.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.12.2010 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
07.12.2010 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
27.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 24
27.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.09.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.06.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.06.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
21.06.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 24
24.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 24
24.07.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.05.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 23
16.03.2007 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 37
16.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.08.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.04.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 84
24.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
24.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
24.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
24.05.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.05.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
29.04.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.04.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
14.10.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.2004 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.09.2004 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 3
31.08.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 European search report Search / examination 4
31.08.2004 Supplemental sheet C (search incomplete) Search / examination 1
26.06.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.03.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.11.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.11.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 82
03.09.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.06.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
06.11.2000 Priority document Search / examination 190
03.11.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.10.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.10.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 299