Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161785

EP1161785 - CABINET FOR RECEIVING ELECTRONIC SUB-ASSEMBLY AND DISTRIBUTION COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NIGGL, Heinz-Jürgen
Am Lindenberg 149
D-82343 Pöcking / DE
02 / BUCHBERGER, Georg
Würmseestrasse 49
D-81476 München / DE
03 / SCHWIND, Stefan
Ernst-Raadts-Weg 6
D-82140 Olching / DE
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Berg, Peter , et al
European Patent Attorney
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date00925046.515.03.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000DE00806
Priority number, dateDE1999204992U18.03.1999         Original published format: DE 29904992 U
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0057523
Date:28.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161785
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161785
Date:21.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02B1/30
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SCHRANK ZUR AUFNAHME ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPEN UND VERTEILERKOMPONENTEN[2001/50]
English:CABINET FOR RECEIVING ELECTRONIC SUB-ASSEMBLY AND DISTRIBUTION COMPONENTS[2001/50]
French:ARMOIRE DESTINEE A RECEVOIR DES MODULES ELECTRONIQUES ET COMPOSANTS DE DISTRIBUTION[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase07.09.2001National basic fee paid 
07.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
30.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YA]FR2711036  (SCHROFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 25 * [A] 2,4;
 [YA]DE29709227U  (KNUERR MECHANIK AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 5 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE29711262U  (KNUERR MECHANIK AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 8 - page 10, paragraph 3 *