blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1189712

EP1189712 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CASTING MOULD PARTS AND COMPRISING AUXILIARY GUIDING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DISA INDUSTRIES A/S
Herlev Hovedgade 17
2730 Herlev / DK
[2002/13]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHANSEN, Jan, Bechmann
Bakkevej 7
DK-3050 Humleb k / DK
 [2002/13]
Representative(s)Roerboel, Leif, et al
Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]Roerboel, Leif, et al
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Soegade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date00925101.811.05.2000
[2002/13]
WO2000DK00250
Priority number, dateWO1999DK0026717.05.1999         Original published format: PCT/DK99/00267
[2002/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0069586
Date:23.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1189712
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1189712
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:B22C11/10, // B22C21:10
[2002/13]
CPC:
B22C21/10 (EP,ES,US); B22C11/10 (EP,ES,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES [2003/01]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GIESSFORMTEILEN MIT FÜHRUNGSHILFSMITTELN[2002/13]
English:APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CASTING MOULD PARTS AND COMPRISING AUXILIARY GUIDING MEANS[2002/13]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE PIECES MOULEES, COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE GUIDAGE AUXILIAIRES[2002/13]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2001National basic fee paid 
17.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/13]
25.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2002Fee for grant paid
29.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US3802486  (OTAKI S) [A] 1-9;
 [A]US3999594  (GUNNERGAARD MARIUS)[A] 1-9;
 [A]EP0020082  (DANSK IND SYNDIKAT [DK]) [A] 1-9;
 [A]EP0231741  (DANSK IND SYNDIKAT [DK]) [A] 1-9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.