Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1173181

EP1173181 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEXUAL DISFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/04]COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEXUAL DISFUNCTION
[2002/47]
StatusThe patent has been limited
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2015Change - German titlepublished on 06.05.2015  [2015/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICOS Corporation
22021 20th Avenue S.E.
Bothell, WA 98201 / US
[2015/13]
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
Lilly Icos LLC
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PULLMAN, William, Ernest
3004 Towne Drive
Carmel, IN 46032 / US
02 / WHITAKER, John, Steven
19340 162nd Avenue
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
 [2002/04]
Representative(s)Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
European Patent Operations
Lilly Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor
Sunninghill Road
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[2015/13]
Former [2003/42]Richardson, Kate , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/04]Richardson, Kate
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00926367.426.04.2000
[2002/04]
WO2000US11129
Priority number, dateUS19990132036P30.04.1999         Original published format: US 132036 P
[2002/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0066099
Date:09.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1173181
Date:23.01.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000
[2002/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1173181
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Type: B3 Limited patent 
No.:EP1173181
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4985, A61P15/10
[2002/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/04]
Extension statesAL23.10.2001
LT23.10.2001
LV23.10.2001
MK23.10.2001
RO23.10.2001
SI23.10.2001
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG SEXUELLER FUNKTIONSSTOERUNGEN DIE PHOSPHODIESTERASE-5 INHIBITOREN ENTHALTEND[2015/19]
English:COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEXUAL DISFUNCTION[2015/13]
French:COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE LA PHOSPHODIESTERASE POUR TRAITER LES DISFONCTIONNEMENTS SEXUELS[2002/47]
Former [2002/04]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG SEXUELLER FUNKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN ENTHALTEND PHOSPHODIESTERASE-5 INHIBITOREN
Former [2002/04]COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEXUAL DISFUNCTION
Former [2002/04]COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE LA PHOSPHODIESTARE POUR TRAITER LES DISFONCTIONNEMENTS SEXUELS
Entry into regional phase23.10.2001National basic fee paid 
23.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
23.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2003Fee for grant paid
24.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03023276.3  / EP1415652
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
02.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Limitations:22.01.2013Date of receipt of request for limitation
 withdrawn
14.02.2014Date of receipt of request for limitation
 admissible
26.01.2015Communication of intention to limit the patent
13.02.2015Fee for printing patent specification after limitation
24.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9703675  (GLAXO WELLCOME LAB SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 3, lines 11,12 * * page 3, lines 24,25 * * page 5, lines 4-11 * * examples 1,3; claim - *;
 [PX]WO9959584  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-19 * page 4, paragraph L * * page 42, lines 11,12 * * page 61, lines 20,21 * * claim 20 *;
 [DX]WO9519978  (GLAXO LAB SA [FR], et al) [DX] 1-12 * page 8, lines 5-15; example 78 * * page 80, lines 21,22 * * page 80, paragraph L * * claims 10,12,14 *;
 [PX]WO0020033  ;
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 29, Database accession no. 2000-339026, XP002152606 & WO0020033 A 20000413 (EISAI CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  - ISRAEL M, "VIAGRA: THE FIRST ORAL TREATMENT FOR IMPOTENCE", PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL,PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY, LONDON,GB, (19980801), vol. 261, ISSN 0031-6873, pages 164 - 165, XP000919343 [A] 1-19 * page 164, columns 1-2 *
 [A]  - GOLDENBERG M M, "SAFETY AND EFFICACY OF SILDENAFIL CITRATE IN THE TREATMENT OF MALE ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS,US,EXCERPTA MEDICA, PRINCETON, NJ, (1998), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 1033 - 1048, XP000853855 [A] 1-19 * page 1041, column 1 - page 1042, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-2918(98)80103-3
ExaminationWO0053148