Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1200090

EP1200090 - Pharmaceutical formulation comprising a beta-carboline and its use for treating sexual dysfunction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/18]BETA-CARBOLINE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS
[2007/36]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICOS Corporation
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[2011/35]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
ICOS Corporation
22021 20th Avenue
Bothell, WA 98021 / US
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Lilly Icos LLC
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OREN, Peter, L.
6358 Manchester Drive
Fishers, IN 46038 / US
02 / ANDERSON, Neil, R.
906 Norhwestern Avenue
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
03 / KRAL, Martha, A.
6125 Haverford Avenue
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Smith, Andrew George , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[2014/36]
Former [2013/37]Barton, Matthew Thomas , et al
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2012/13]Barton, Matthew Thomas , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Barton, Matthew Thomas , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/18]Richardson, Kate
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00926368.226.04.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000US11130
Priority number, dateUS19990146924P03.08.1999         Original published format: US 146924 P
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0108686
Date:08.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1200090
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1200090
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4985, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61P15/10
[2007/36]
Former International [2002/18]A61K31/495, A61K9/20, A61P15/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/18]
Extension statesAL17.01.2002
LT17.01.2002
LV17.01.2002
MK17.01.2002
RO17.01.2002
SI17.01.2002
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Formulierung enthaltend ein beta-Carbolin und ihre Verwendung zur Behandlung der sexuellen Dysfunktion[2013/14]
English:Pharmaceutical formulation comprising a beta-carboline and its use for treating sexual dysfunction[2013/14]
French:Formulation pharmaceutique à base d'une béta-carboline et son utilisation pour traiter le dysfonctionnement sexuel[2013/14]
Former [2002/18]PHARMAZEUTISCHE BETA-CARBOLINE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [2002/18]BETA-CARBOLINE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS
Former [2002/18]COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE DE BETA-CARBOLINE
Entry into regional phase17.01.2002National basic fee paid 
17.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
14.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2012Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.06.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2013Fee for grant paid
31.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012886.7  / EP2338491
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lek d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lek d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Lek d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  11.06.2014   
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
21.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.04.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition09.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1362/16
17.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
09.08.2012Appeal received
26.10.2012Statement of grounds filed
14.11.2012Interlocutory revision of appeal
30.07.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9703675  (GLAXO WELLCOME LAB SA [FR], et al) [DX] 1-4,6,8,9,12-14,16,25-27 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 8 * * page 3, line 24 - line 25 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, line 15 - line 26; example 1 * * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 7; example 1; claims 1,2,4-12 *;
 [DX]WO9638131  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-3,6-10,12,22-27 * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 9 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 3 * * page 14, line 13 - page 16, line 5 * * page 18, line 15 - page 19, line 5; claims 1,2,5 *;
 [A]WO9823270  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-25 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, line 21 - line 27 * * page 8, line 4 - line 10; example -; claims 1-4,6,9,10 *
ExaminationWO0066099
 WO0066114
 WO0108688
 US5859006
 US4605517
 US5985326
by applicantUS5859006
 US4605517