Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161293

EP1161293 - CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Disa A/S
Herlev Hovedgade 17
2730 Herlev / DK
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Bihlet, Klaus
Gjerlevvej 13
DK-8983 Gjerlev / DK
02 / Bishop, Angus J.
11 Ramsey Avenue, Bishopthorpe
York North Yorkshire YO23 2SQ / GB
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2008/41]
Former [2002/08]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [2001/50]Graf von Wengersky, Anton, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00926730.302.03.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000EP01801
Priority number, dateDE199910907502.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19909075
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0051709
Date:08.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1161293
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161293
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01D46/04
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2001/50]
English:CLEANING DEVICE[2001/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2001National basic fee paid 
03.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
20.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2003Fee for grant paid
17.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.06.2003
FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
AT02.03.2004
LU02.03.2004
[2007/08]
Former [2005/51]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
AT02.03.2004
LU02.03.2004
Former [2005/23]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
LU02.03.2004
Former [2004/15]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0531657  (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4289511  (JOHNSON JR ALLEN S) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4280826  (JOHNSON JR ALLEN S) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *