Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1177225

EP1177225 - ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS AND FILMS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited
Hawkslease
Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]For all designated states
Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited
Hawkslease
Chapel lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Former [2009/03]For all designated states
INEOS EUROPE LIMITED
Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Former [2007/12]For all designated states
INEOS EUROPE LIMITED
Hawkslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire, SO43 7FG / GB
Former [2006/33]For all designated states
INEOS EUROPE LIMITED
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines
Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
INNOVENE EUROPE LIMITED
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex
TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
INNOVENE EUROPE LIMITED
79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex
TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Innovene Europe Limited
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB
Former [2005/28]For all designated states
O & D Trading Limited
Chertsey Road
Sunbury on Thames Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB
Former [2002/06]For all designated states
BP Chemicals Limited
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7BA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Chai, Choon Kooi
7, avenue Van Gogh
Domaine de Ca las, -13480 Cabries / FR
02 / Frye, Christopher James
20, chemin des Cabanes
13500 St Julien-Martigues / FR
 [2002/06]
Representative(s)Hawkins, David George , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]Hawkins, David George , et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey
Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB
Former [2006/33]Hawkins, David George , et al
COMPASS PATENT LLP Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2005/25]Hawkins, David George , et al
O & D Trading Limited Patents and Agreements Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2002/06]Hawkins, David George , et al
BP International Limited Group Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date00927449.926.04.2000
[2002/06]
WO2000GB01611
Priority number, dateGB1999000137005.05.1999         Original published format: GB 9901370
GB1999002720517.11.1999         Original published format: GB 9927205
[2002/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0068285
Date:16.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1177225
Date:06.02.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000
[2002/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1177225
Date:14.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/16, C08J5/18, C08F4/642, C08L23/16
[2002/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/03]
Former [2002/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL25.10.2001
LT25.10.2001
LV25.10.2001
MK25.10.2001
RO25.10.2001
SI25.10.2001
TitleGerman:ETHYLENCOPOLYMERE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE FILME[2002/06]
English:ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS AND FILMS THEREOF[2002/06]
French:COPOLYMERES D'ETHYLENE ET FILMS EN COPOLYMERES D'ETHYLENE[2002/06]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2001National basic fee paid 
25.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/06]
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.04.2007
26.03.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2008Fee for grant paid
03.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.10.2009  28.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 [2013/03]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  14.10.2009   
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
20.11.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.05.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2010Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2010Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
22.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.12.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/51]
Appeal following opposition09.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0487/12
12.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
07.12.2012Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
07.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.01.2008Request for further processing filed
16.01.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.01.2008Decision despatched
10.05.2005Request for further processing filed
09.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.01.2009
CY14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
IE26.04.2009
LU26.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
IE26.04.2009
LU26.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
Former [2010/47]AT14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
IE26.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
Former [2010/21]AT14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
IE26.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
Former [2010/08]AT14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
Former [2009/46]AT14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
Former [2009/40]AT14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
Former [2009/38]SE14.04.2009
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9744371  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * page 54 - page 58; example 4; claim -; table 1 *;
 [DX]WO9414855  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [DX] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * page 1, line 7 - line 30; example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9818842  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * page 1, line 18 - page 3, line 34; example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9504761  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * page 18, line 19 - page 21, line 11; examples 8-12; claim - *;
 [X]EP0735060  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * example -; claim -; table - *;
 [X]EP0610942  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * claim -; table - *