Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1181690

EP1181690 - DATA SET TO RECORDING MEDIA REGISTRATION AND SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
For:MC 
IBM United Kingdom Limited
P.O. Box 41 North Harbour
Portsmouth Hampshire PO6 3AU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BUI, Nhan, Xuan
7402 E 29th Street
Tucson, AZ 85710 / US
02 / JAQUETTE, Glen, Alan
5270 N Rocky Ridge Place
Tucson, AZ 85750 / US
03 / KOSKI, John, Alexander
3752 N Via De La Luna
Tucson, AZ 85749 / US
04 / TSURUTA, Kazuhiro
1-18-10-502 Higashirinkan
Sagamihara City, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Jennings, Michael John , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]Jennings, Michael John , et al
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Former [2002/09]Jennings, Michael John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date00927599.118.05.2000
[2002/09]
WO2000GB01899
Priority number, dateUS1999031407319.05.1999         Original published format: US 314073
[2002/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0072323
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1181690
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2002/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1181690
Date:23.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/32, G11B27/36, G11B15/087
[2002/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/30]
Former [2002/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFZEICHNUNG UND SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES DATENSATZES AUF SPEICHERMEDIEN[2002/09]
English:DATA SET TO RECORDING MEDIA REGISTRATION AND SYNCHRONIZATION[2002/09]
French:ENSEMBLE DE DONNEES DESTINE A L'INSCRIPTION ET A LA SYNCHRONISATION DE SUPPORTS D'ENREGISTREMENT[2002/09]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2001National basic fee paid 
11.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/09]
17.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2003Fee for grant paid
11.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
IT23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
DK23.10.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
ES03.11.2003
PT23.12.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2007/08]AT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
DK23.10.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
ES03.11.2003
PT23.12.2003
Former [2004/46]AT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
DK23.10.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
ES03.11.2003
PT23.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
DK23.10.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
PT23.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
DK23.10.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT23.07.2003
BE23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
Former [2004/22]AT23.07.2003
CH23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
LI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
GR23.10.2003
SE23.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT23.07.2003
FI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
GR23.10.2003
Former [2004/13]FI23.07.2003
NL23.07.2003
Former [2004/12]FI23.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[PAD]US5930065  (ALBRECHT THOMAS ROBERT [US], et al) [PAD] 1,9,17 * the whole document * * A: JP 10334453 (1998-12-18) abstract *;
 [A]EP0569610  (TANDBERG DATA [NO]) [A] 1,2,9,10,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5568327  (PAHR PER O [NO], et al) [A] 1,9,17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BARRETT R C ET AL, "TIMING-BASED TRACK-FOLLOWING SERVO FOR LINEAR TAPE SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (199807), vol. 34, no. 4, PART 01, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 1872 - 1877, XP000833231 [A] 1,2,9,10,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.706730