Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1185695

EP1185695 - PROCESS FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT DNA METHYLATION ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 09.11.2016  [2016/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
[2016/45]
Former [2006/28]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
3716 South Hope Street Suite 313
Los Angeles, CA 90007-4344 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAIRD, Peter, W.
649 Forest Avenue
South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US
02 / EADS, Cindy, A.
635 Prospect Street B15
South Pasadena, CA 91010 / US
03 / DANENBERG, Kathleen, D.
3367 Rubio Crest Drive
Altadena, CA 91001 / US
 [2002/11]
Representative(s)Zwicker, Jörk
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/45]Zwicker, Jörk
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Former [2013/24]Zwicker, Jörk
Dr. Volker Vossius
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Krauss, Jan , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/49]Krauss, Jan , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/34]Krauss, Jan , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Hollerallee 32
28209 Bremen / DE
Former [2002/11]Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date00928969.512.05.2000
[2002/11]
WO2000US13029
Priority number, dateUS1999031191214.05.1999         Original published format: US 311912
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0070090
Date:23.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1185695
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1185695
Date:12.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1185695
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2002/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2016/45]
Former [2002/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE DER DNA-METHYLIERUNG MIT HOHER DURCHSATZRATE[2002/11]
English:PROCESS FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT DNA METHYLATION ANALYSIS[2002/11]
French:PROCEDE D'ANALYSE A HAUT RENDEMENT DE LA METHYLATION D'ADN[2002/11]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2001National basic fee paid 
13.12.2001Search fee paid 
13.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
30.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
15.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2006Fee for grant paid
20.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06011777.7  / EP1710321
EP15198400.2   Application refused  : 29.08.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2007  21.01.2008  WITHDRAWN
Oncomethylome Sciences, S.A.
CHU, Tour 5 GIGA, niveau 3 Avenue de l'Hopital 11
4000 Sart-Tilman (Liege) / BE
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  12.04.2007  24.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Applera Corporation
Applied Biosystems Group 850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [2015/23]
Former [2008/09]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2007  21.01.2008  WITHDRAWN
Oncomethylome Sciences, S.A.
CHU, Tour 5 GIGA, niveau 3 Avenue de l'Hopital 11
4000 Sart-Tilman (Liege) / BE
Opponent's representative
Baldock, Sharon Claire
BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  12.04.2007  24.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Applera Corporation
Applied Biosystems Group 850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2007/37]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2007  24.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Oncomethylome Sciences, S.A.
CHU, Tour 5 GIGA, niveau 3 Avenue de l'Hopital 11
4000 Sart-Tilman (Liege) / BE
Opponent's representative
Baldock, Sharon Claire
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  12.04.2007  24.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Applera Corporation
Applied Biosystems Group 850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2007/21]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2007   
Oncomethylome Sciences SA
Kapucijnenvoer 33 Block "n" (3rd floor)
3000 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Baldock, Sharon Claire
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  12.04.2007   
Applera Corporation
Applied Biosystems Group 850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
22.05.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.11.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2016
19.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
09.03.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.04.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.08.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.09.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition17.12.2008Appeal received No.  T0021/09
20.03.2009Statement of grounds filed
17.10.2013Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2013/42]
30.12.2013Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/01]
13.11.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
GR13.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
MC31.05.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]FI12.07.2006
GR13.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
MC31.05.2007
Former [2008/09]FI12.07.2006
PT12.12.2006
MC31.05.2007
Former [2008/04]FI12.07.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/35]FI12.07.2006
IT12.07.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/12]FI12.07.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/09]FI12.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9746705  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 15 * * examples 1-8 * * claims 1-36 *;
 [A]US5876930  (LIVAK KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 31 * * claims 1-39 *;
 [A]US5804375  (GELFAND DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5736333  (LIVAK KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5866336  (NAZARENKO IRINA A [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5210015  (GELFAND DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - HERMAN J G ET AL, "METHYLATION-SPECIFIC PCR: A NOVEL PCR ASSAY FOR METHYLATION STATUS OF CPG ISLANDS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19960901), vol. 93, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9821 - 9826, XP002910406 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 9822 - page 9824 * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.18.9821
 [Y]  - ZESCHNIGK M ET AL, "A SINGLE-TUBE PCR TEST FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF ANGELMAN AND PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME BASED ON ALLELIC METHYLATION DIFFERENCES AT THE SNRPN LOCUS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (1997), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1018-4813, pages 94 - 98, XP009011533 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * figure 1 *
 [Y]  - KUBOTA T ET AL, "A new assay for the analysis of X-chromosome inactivation based on methylation-specific PCR", HUMAN GENETICS, BERLIN, DE, (199901), vol. 104, no. 1, ISSN 0340-6717, pages 49 - 55, XP002967416 [Y] 1-28 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390050909
 [Y]  - BERNARD P S ET AL, "HOMOGENEOUS MULTIPLEX GENOTYPING OF HEMOCHROMATOSIS MUTATIONS WITH FLUORESCENT HYBRIDIZATION PROBES", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1998), vol. 153, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1055 - 1061, XP000874040 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 1056 * * page 1057, paragraph L - page 1058 * * page 1060 * * figures 1-5 * * pages 1-2 *
 [Y]  - LEE L G ET AL, "ALLELIC DISCRIMINATION BZ NICK-TRANSLATION PCR WITH FLUOROGENIC PROBES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19930811), vol. 21, no. 16, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3761 - 3766, XP000470188 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 3763, column L *
 [DA]  - HEID C A ET AL, "REAL TIME QUANTITATIVE PCR", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (19961001), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 986 - 994, XP000642795 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - GIBSON U E M ET AL, "A NOVEL METHOD FOR REAL TIME QUANTITATIVE RT-PCR", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (19961001), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 995 - 1001, XP000642796 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - LIVAK K J ET AL, "Oligonucleotides with fluorescent dyes at opposite ends provide a quenched probe system useful for detecting PCR product and nucleic acid hybridization.", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS. UNITED STATES JUN 1995, (199506), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1054-9803, pages 357 - 362, XP009028486 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SWAN DAVID C ET AL, "A sensitive, type-specific, fluorogenic probe assay for detection of human papillomavirus DNA", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199704), vol. 35, no. 4, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 886 - 891, XP002970544 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - TYAGI S ET AL, "Multicolor molecular beacons for allele discrimination", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (1998), vol. 16, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 49 - 53, XP002143901 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0198-49
 [DA]  - FROMMER M ET AL, "A GENOMIC SEQUENCING PROTOCOL THAT YIELDS A POSITIVE DISPLAY OF 5-METHYLCYTOSINE RESIDUES IN INDIVIDUAL DNA STRANDS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199203), vol. 89, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1827 - 1831, XP009016394 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.5.1827
 [A]  - REIN ET AL, "Identifying 5-methylcytosine and related modifications in DNA genomes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1998), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2255 - 2264, XP002143106 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.10.2255
 [A]  - HOLLAND P M ET AL, "DETECTION OF SPECIFIC POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION PRODUCT BY UTILIZING THE 5' ->3' EXONUCLEASE ACTIVITY OF THERMUS AQUATICUS DNA POLYMERASE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19910801), vol. 88, no. 16, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7276 - 7280, XP000606188 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.16.7276
 [A]  - NAZARENKO ET AL, "A CLOSED TUBE FORMAT FOR AMPLIFICATION AND DETECTION OF DNA BASED ENERGY TRANSFER", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1997), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2516 - 2521, XP002094959 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.12.2516
 [A]  - TYAGI S ET AL, "MOLECULAR BEACONS: PROBES THAT FLUORESCE UPON HYBRIDIZATION", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (19960301), vol. 14, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 303 - 308, XP000196024 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0396-303
International search[PX]US6017704  (HERMAN JAMES G [US], et al);
 [X]US5786146  (HERMAN JAMES G [US], et al)
Opposition   - HERMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 9821 - 9826,
    - XIONG AND LAIRD, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2532 - 2534,
    - GONZALGO AND JONES, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2529 - 2531,