Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1292451

EP1292451 - LAMINATED INK DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY FOR A PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Silverbrook, Kia
Silverbrook Research Pty. Ltd. 393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
 [2003/12]
Representative(s)Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2008/32]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2003/12]McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date00929106.324.05.2000
[2003/12]
WO2000AU00594
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0189849
Date:29.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1292451
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001
[2003/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1292451
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU29.11.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2003/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:LAMINIERTE TINTENDOSIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DRUCKER[2003/12]
English:LAMINATED INK DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY FOR A PRINTER[2003/12]
French:ENSEMBLE STRATIFIE DE DISTRIBUTION D'ENCRE POUR IMPRIMANTE[2003/12]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2002National basic fee paid 
23.12.2002Search fee paid 
23.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
23.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/12]
05.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2008Fee for grant paid
12.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200405   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2004
31.05.200506   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
CY29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
LU24.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
LU24.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/47]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/08]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/04]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2009/39]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/38]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/34]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
Former [2009/20]ES09.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19743804  (POLITRUST AG, KUESNACHT, CH) [A] 1-11,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0666174  (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) [A] 1-11,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH1095114
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10095114 A 19980414 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11,18 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5594481  ;
 [A]US5017947  ;
 [A]GB2267255  ;
 [X]EP0584823  ;
 [X]GB2115748  ;
 [X]JPH11179900