EP1181123 - CUTTER INSERT, ESPECIALLY AN INDEXABLE TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. Route 981 South Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTLÖHNER, Rudi Falkenstrasse 12 D-90587 Tuchenbach / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2002/09] | Application number, filing date | 00929463.8 | 28.04.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000EP03881 | Priority number, date | DE1999120192 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920192 | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066302 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181123 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181123 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B23B27/143 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
Y10T407/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINSATZ, INSBESONDERE WENDEPLATTE | [2002/09] | English: | CUTTER INSERT, ESPECIALLY AN INDEXABLE TIP | [2002/09] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE RAPPORTE, NOTAMMENT PLAQUETTE REVERSIBLE | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 10.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.04.2003 | IE | 02.04.2003 | AT | 28.04.2003 | CY | 28.04.2003 | LU | 28.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | DK | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
IE | 02.04.2003 | ||
AT | 28.04.2003 | ||
CY | 28.04.2003 | ||
LU | 28.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/43] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
IE | 02.04.2003 | ||
AT | 28.04.2003 | ||
LU | 28.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
IE | 02.04.2003 | ||
LU | 28.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
IE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
IE | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 02.04.2003 | |
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.07.2003 | |
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3815191 (HOLMA J) [A] * figure 1 *; | [YA]US3975809 (SORICE EDWARD L, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 7; figure 4 * [A] 2,3; | [A]DE2545769 (HEINLEIN HANS) [A] * figure 4 *; | [A]US4214847 (KRAEMER ROLF H [US]) [A] * figure 2 *; | [YA]DE4134335 (NEUMO GRUNDBESITZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 12; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [A] - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK., SPRINGER VERLAG. BERLIN., DE, (197112), vol. 61, no. 12, ISSN 0340-4544, pages 801 - 802, XP002145332 [A] 1,11 * figure 7 * |