blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1102372

EP1102372 - CREEPING DISCHARGE LIGHTNING ARRESTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.07.2006  [2006/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyushu Electric Power Co., Inc.
1-82, Watanabedori 2-chome Chuo-ku, Fukuoka-shi
Fukuoka-ken 810-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Kyushu Electric Power Co., Inc.
1-82, Watanabedori 2-chome Chuo-ku, Fukuoka-shi
Fukuoka-ken 810-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morooka, Yasunari Kyushu Electric Power Co., Inc.
1-82, Watanabe-dori 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0004 / JP
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J., et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date00929837.323.05.2000
[2001/21]
WO2000JP03286
Priority number, dateJP1999014563425.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14563499
[2001/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0072417
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102372
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102372
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01T4/14, H02H9/06, H01T4/08
[2003/28]
CPC:
H01T4/14 (EP,KR,US); H01T4/08 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2001/21]H01T4/14, H02H9/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERSPANNUNGSABLEITER MIT KRIECHSTROMENTLADUNG[2001/21]
English:CREEPING DISCHARGE LIGHTNING ARRESTOR[2001/21]
French:DECHARGEUR DE FOUDRE A DECHARGE RAMPANTE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2001Translation filed 
01.02.2001National basic fee paid 
01.02.2001Search fee paid 
01.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
09.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2005Fee for grant paid
31.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04018368.3  / EP1473809
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9719456  (PODPORKIN GEORGY VIKTOROVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 16; figures 6,7 * * page 18, line 31 - page 19, line 2; figure 17 * [A] 5
International search[X]JPH04282586  (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD);
 [X]JPH10284214  (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al);
 [AP]JPH11332076  (KYUSHU ELECTRIC POWER)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.