Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240213

EP1240213 - METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univation Technologies LLC
Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe
Houston, TX 77056 / US
[2007/49]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Univation Technologies LLC
Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe
Houston, TX 77056 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OSKAM, John, H.
14 Fawn Drive
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
02 / LYNN, Timothy, R.
575 Rockport Road
Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US
03 / MORRISON, Vincent, P.
4 Wynnwood Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Bublak, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Bublak, Wolfgang, Dr. , et al
Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/38]Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler, Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00930739.815.05.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US13308
Priority number, dateUS1999046411416.12.1999         Original published format: US 464114
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144321
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240213
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240213
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00, C08F4/02, C08F4/64
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/38]
TitleGerman:POLYMERIZATIONSVERFAHREN[2002/38]
English:METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2002National basic fee paid 
15.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2007Fee for grant paid
08.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07023470.3  / EP1914252
Opposition(s)08.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46]
Request for further processing for:06.04.2006Request for further processing filed
06.04.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.04.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
CY05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
GR06.03.2008
PT05.05.2008
IE15.05.2008
LU15.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
[2010/32]
Former [2009/33]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
CY05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
GR06.03.2008
PT05.05.2008
IE15.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/23]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
GR06.03.2008
PT05.05.2008
IE15.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/13]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
GR06.03.2008
PT05.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
PT05.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2008/46]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
DK05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
PT05.05.2008
Former [2008/42]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
PT05.05.2008
Former [2008/40]AT05.12.2007
BE05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
Former [2008/29]AT05.12.2007
CH05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
Former [2008/24]CH05.12.2007
FI05.12.2007
LI05.12.2007
NL05.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[XDY]US5672669  (WASSERMAN ERIC PAUL [US], et al) [XD] 1,15-27 * column 6, line 63 - column 10, line 18; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2-14;
 [X]EP0890581  (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH]) [X] 1,15-27 * page 4, line 44 - page 4, line 51; claims 1-21 *;
 [XY]EP0279586  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,15-27,37-40 * page 11, line 29 - page 11, line 57; example 6 * [Y] 28-34;
 [X]EP0357135  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 46 - page 3, line 47; claim 1 *;
 [XDY]EP0874005  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XD] 35-40 * the whole document * [Y] 2-14,28-34;
 [XDY]EP0893454  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XD] 35,36 * the whole document * [Y] 2-14;
 [XY]WO9901460  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 35,36 * the whole document * [Y] 2-14;
 [XY]EP0761694  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 37-40 * the whole document * [Y] 28-34