Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1185327

EP1185327 - SINGLE LUMEN BALLOON-TIPPED MICRO CATHETER WITH REINFORCED SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 15.01.2014  [2014/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
[2012/31]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PATTERSON, Marlowe, E.
2845 North Roxbury Street
Orange, CA 92867 / US
02 / CHIEN, Thomas, Yung-Hui
2653 Ramsdell Place
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
03 / DOAN, Hanh
218 Beaumere Way
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
04 / DOAN, Hong
1923 Vinedale Square
San Jose, CA 95132 / US
05 / CHAN, Huey, Quoc
Apartment D
2297 Warfield Way
San Jose, CA 95122 / US
06 / NITA, Henry
2047 Seabrook Court
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US
 [2012/31]
Former [2002/27]01 / PATTERSON, Marlowe, E.
2845 North Roxbury Street
Orange, CA 92867 / US
02 / CHIEN, Thomas, Yung-Hui
2653 Ramsdell Place
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
03 / DOAN, Hanh
218 Beaumere Way
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
04 / DOAN, Hong
1923 Vinedale Square
San Jose, CA 95132 / US
05 / CHAN, Huey, Quoc
Apartment D, 2297 Warfield Way
San Jose, CA 95122 / US
06 / NITA, Henry
2047 Seabrook Court
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US
Former [2002/11]01 / PATTERSON, Marlowe, E.
1697 Crater Lake Avenue
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / CHIEN, Thomas, Yung-Hui
2653 Ramsdell Place
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
03 / DOAN, Hanh
218 Beaumere Way
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
04 / DOAN, Hong
1923 Vinedale Square
San Jose, CA 95132 / US
05 / CHAN, Huey, Quoc
Apartment D, 2297 Warfield Way
San Jose, CA 95122 / US
06 / NITA, Henry
2047 Seabrook Court
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US
Representative(s)Hermann, Gerhard , et al
Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hermann, Gerhard , et al
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Former [2002/11]Kiliaridis, Constantin , et al
Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Application number, filing date00932184.509.05.2000
[2002/11]
WO2000US12573
Priority number, dateUS1999031144614.05.1999         Original published format: US 311446
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0069502
Date:23.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1185327
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1185327
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61M29/00
[2002/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/11]
TitleGerman:EINLUMIGER, BALLONBEWEHRTER MIKROKATHETER MIT VERSTÄRKTEM SCHAFT[2002/11]
English:SINGLE LUMEN BALLOON-TIPPED MICRO CATHETER WITH REINFORCED SHAFT[2002/11]
French:MICROCATHETER A LUMIERE UNIQUE MUNI D'UN BALLONNET ET D'UNE TIGE RENFORCEE[2002/11]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2001National basic fee paid 
05.12.2001Search fee paid 
05.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
28.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2012Fee for grant paid
18.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2011
Opposition(s)03.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
MC01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
[2014/03]
Former [2013/23]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
IT01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
ES12.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
DK01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/15]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
NL01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
PT03.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT01.08.2012
BE01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
SE01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
GR02.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT01.08.2012
CY01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT01.08.2012
FI01.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT01.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0778037  (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 5, line 14 - column 7, line 6; figure - *;
 [X]EP0823262  (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0608853  (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5378236  (SEIFERT C VAUGHN [US]);
 [Y]US4702252  (BROOKS KENNETH J [GB], et al);
 [Y]US5722424  (ENGELSON ERIK T [US]);
 [Y]US4187960  (BONK JOSEPH P [US]);
 [X]US3850720  (COLLINS M)
by applicantUS5776099
 US4813934