Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1183346

EP1183346 - METHOD FOR GENERATING SPLIT, NON-TRANSFERABLE GENES THAT ARE ABLE TO EXPRESS AN ACTIVE PROTEIN PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC.
240 County Road
Ipswich, MA 01938-2723 / US
For all designated states
Boston Biomedical Research Institute
25 Grove Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
[2008/08]
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC.
32, Tozer Road Beverly
Massachusetts 01915 / US
For all designated states
Boston Biomedical Research Institute
25 Grove Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
Former [2002/10]For all designated states
NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC.
32, Tozer Road
Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US
For all designated states
Boston Biomedical Research Institute
25 Grove Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Ming-Qun
40 Crescent Road
Hamilton, MA 01982 / US
02 / EVANS, Thomas, C.
1st floor, 68 Albion Street
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
03 / PRADHAN, Sriharsa
6 Beverly Commons, Essex 1
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
04 / COMB, Donald, G.
9 Proctor Street
Manchester, MA 01944 / US
05 / PAULUS, Henry
85 East India Row
Boston, MA 02210 / US
06 / SUN, Luo
46 Plum Street
Hamilton, MA 01982 / US
07 / CHEN, Lixin
60 Rantoul Street 409
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
08 / GHOSH, Inca
10 Cottage Avenue
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
 [2002/10]
Representative(s)Froud, Clive
Clive Froud & Co Limited
7 Hurst Close
Tenterden
Ashford
Kent TN30 6UG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Froud, Clive
Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford
Kent TN30 6UG / GB
Former [2005/41]Froud, Clive
7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford
Kent TN30 6UG / GB
Former [2004/20]Froud, Clive
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2002/10]Davies, Jonathan Mark
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date00932712.323.05.2000
[2002/10]
WO2000US14122
Priority number, dateUS19990135677P24.05.1999         Original published format: US 135677 P
[2002/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0071701
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1183346
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2002/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1183346
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C12N15/62, C12N15/64, C12P21/02
[2002/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2002/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GETRENNTEN, NICHT-ÜBERTRAGBAREN GENEN, WELCHE BEFÄHIGT SIND EIN AKTIVES PROTEINPRODUKT ZU EXPRIMIEREN[2007/24]
English:METHOD FOR GENERATING SPLIT, NON-TRANSFERABLE GENES THAT ARE ABLE TO EXPRESS AN ACTIVE PROTEIN PRODUCT[2002/10]
French:PROCEDE DE GENERATION DE GENES NON TRANSFERABLES SEPARES CAPABLES D'EXPRIMER UN PRODUIT PROTEIQUE ACTIF[2002/10]
Former [2002/10]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GETRENNTEN, NICHT-üBERTRAGBAREN GENEN, WELCHE BEFäHIGT SIND EIN AKTIVES PROTEINPRODUKT ZU EXPRIMIEREN
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase17.12.2001National basic fee paid 
17.12.2001Search fee paid 
17.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/10]
26.02.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2007Fee for grant paid
07.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0052146  (MAXYGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 1-9,12,13,16,17,21-25,33,34 * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 25 * * page 14, line 10 - page 25, line 26 * * page 34, line 15 - page 47, line 15 *;
 [XA]EP0218571  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 26 * the whole document * * page 2, line 50 - line 54 * [A] 9-11,14,15;
 [X]EP0257993  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 28 * page 16, line 52 - page 21, line 27 *;
 [X]WO9208794  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 30 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - WU H ET AL, "Protein trans-splicing by a split intein encoded in a split DnaE gene of Synechocystis sp. PCC6803", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199808), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9226 - 9231, XP002137477 [X] 1-6,9,12,33,34 * page 9228, column 2, paragraph L - page 9230, column 1, line 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.16.9226
 [DA]  - GUSTIN K E ET AL, "A RAPID METHOD FOR GENERATING LINKER SCANNING MUTANTS UTILIZING PCR", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (1993), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0736-6205, page 22,24, XP000331739 [DA] 23 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5834247  (COMB DONALD G [US], et al);
 [A]  - CHONG ET AL., "single-column purification of free recombinant proteins using a self-cleavable affinity tag derived from a protein splicing element", GENE, (1997), vol. 192, pages 271 - 281, XP002931210

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00105-4
 [A]  - XU M.-Q., "The IMPACT of protein splicing research", THE NEB TRANSCRIPT, (199701), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 1 - 5, XP002931211
 [A]  - SOUTHWORTH ET AL., "Control of protein splicing by interin fragment reassembly", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 918 - 926, XP002931212

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.4.918