Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101045

EP1101045 - CONTROLLABLE ANTI-VIBRATION MOUNTING, NOTABLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG
Postfach 1220
49441 Lemförde / DE
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / ERSOY, Metin
Eichenweg 1a
D-65396 Walluf / DE
02 / MEYERINK, Frank
Marienstrasse 28
D-49393 Lohne / DE
 [2001/21]
Application number, filing date00934931.726.04.2000
[2001/21]
WO2000DE01294
Priority number, dateDE199911987630.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19919876
[2001/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0066911
Date:09.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101045
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101045
Date:05.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/30
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/45]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:STEUERBARES HYDROLAGER, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2001/21]
English:CONTROLLABLE ANTI-VIBRATION MOUNTING, NOTABLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[2001/21]
French:PALIER HYDRAULIQUE REGLABLE, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
23.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2003Fee for grant paid
17.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0312719  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 7,8 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 16 *;
 [A]US5060919  (TAKANO KAZUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19617839  (METZELER GIMETALL AG [DE])
by applicantDE4122360
 DE19617839