Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1120225

EP1120225 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FILM AND MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.08.2011
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2011Revocation of patentpublished on 14.09.2011  [2011/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Ieyasu
37-19, Oyama 3-chome
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP
02 / OSAWA, Toshifumi
37-19, Oyama 3-chome
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP
 [2001/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/31]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00935631.209.06.2000
[2001/31]
WO2000JP03780
Priority number, dateJP1999016659314.06.1999         Original published format: JP 16659399
JP1999034739107.12.1999         Original published format: JP 34739199
[2001/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0076749
Date:21.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1120225
Date:01.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000
[2001/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1120225
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B29C55/12, C08J5/18, G11B5/73, G11B5/64
[2002/45]
Former International [2001/31]B29C55/12, C08J5/18, G11B5/73, // (B29K67/00, C08L67:02)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTE POLYESTERFOLIE UND MAGNETISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2001/31]
English:BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FILM AND MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM[2001/31]
French:FILM POLYESTER ETIRE BI-AXIALEMENT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE[2001/31]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2001Translation filed 
14.02.2001National basic fee paid 
14.02.2001Search fee paid 
14.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
10.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2004Fee for grant paid
17.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.07.2005  10.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Toray Industries, Inc.
2-1 Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
Opponent's representative
Kador, Utz Ulrich
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.2005  10.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Toray Industries, Inc.
2-1 Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
Opponent's representative
Kador, Ulrich
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2005/39]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.2005  10.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Toray Industries, Inc.
2-1 Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
Opponent's representative
Kador, Ulrich
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
29.08.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.03.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.05.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.10.2004
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS59127730  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, column L, line 18 - line 20 * * page 1, column R, line 1 - line 11 * * page 2, column R, line 28 - line 35 * * page 4, column L, line 19 - line 20 * * page 6 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO9925553  (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 9 - line 10 * * page 4, line 27 - line 28 * * page 6, line 17 - line 18 * * page 16, line 18 - line 27 * * page 21, line 4 - line 6; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0893249  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 3-7,9-11 * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 5, line 37 - line 54 * * page 6, line 13 - line 28 * * page 13; table 2 *;
 [Y]EP0843210  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * page 7, line 1 - line 7; claim 1 *
International search[A]JPH08244110
 [A]WO9929488
 [A]JPH05212787
 [A]JPH11129327
ExaminationJPH05212786