Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1201724

EP1201724 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE FOR PROVISIONALLY FIXING GREEN SHEET FOR CERAMIC ELECTRONIC PART AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC ELECTRONIC PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nitta Corporation
4-26, Sakuragawa 4-chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 556-0022 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Nitta Corporation
4-26, Sakuragawa 4-chome, Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0022 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Eiji, Nitta Corp. Nara Factory
172, Ikezawa-cho
Yamatokooriyama-shi, Nara 639-1085 / JP
02 / KASAZAKI, Toshiaki, Nitta Corp. Nara Factory
172, Ikezawa-cho
Yamatokooriyama-shi, Nara 639-1085 / JP
03 / KAWAHARA, Shinichiro, Nitta Corp. Nara Factory
172, Ikezawa-cho
Yamatokooriyama-shi, Nara 639-1085 / JP
04 / YAMAMOTO, Masayoshi, Nitta Corp. Nara Factory
172, Ikezawa-cho
Yamatokooriyama-shi, Nara 639-1085 / JP
05 / NAGAI, Kiyotaka, Nitta Corp. Nara Factory
172, Ikezawa-cho
Yamatokooriyama-shi, Nara 639-1085 / JP
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Tanner, James Percival
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Tanner, James Percival
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00935640.309.06.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000JP03795
Priority number, dateJP1999016450810.06.1999         Original published format: JP 16450899
[2002/18]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0077112
Date:21.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1201724
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/02, C09J133/06, H01G4/12, H01G4/30, C04B35/622
[2002/38]
Former International [2002/18]C09J7/02, C09J133/06, H01G4/12, H01G4/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/18]
TitleGerman:DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES KLEBEBAND ZUM PROVISORISCHEN FIXIEREN EINER KERAMISCHEN FOLIE FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES TEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERAMISCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN TEILS[2002/18]
English:PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE FOR PROVISIONALLY FIXING GREEN SHEET FOR CERAMIC ELECTRONIC PART AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC ELECTRONIC PART[2002/18]
French:BANDE ADHESIVE POUR FIXER PROVISOIREMENT UNE FEUILLE A L'ETAT VERT DESTINEE A UNE PIECE ELECTRONIQUE CERAMIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CETTE PIECE[2002/18]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2001Translation filed 
13.12.2001National basic fee paid 
13.12.2001Search fee paid 
13.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/18]
21.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
07.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS5659882  ;
 [A]JPH05294741  ;
 [AD]JPS6333487
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810811), vol. 005, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 066), & JP56059882 A 19810523 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 49, Database accession no. 1993-392486, XP002207691 & JPH05294741 A 19931109 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880708), vol. 012, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 510), & JP63033487 A 19880213 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH09251923  (NITTA KK);
 [Y]JPH09208924  (NITTA KK);
 [Y]JPH09251273  (NITTA KK);
 [Y]JPH09251272  (NITTA KK);
 [Y]WO9213901  (LANDEC LAB INC [US]);
 [Y]WO9013420  (LANDEC LAB INC [US])