Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1198605

EP1198605 - METHODS OF FORMING STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 17.11.2010  [2010/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bechtel BWXT Idaho, LLC
P.O. Box 1625
Idaho Falls, ID 83415-3899 / US
[2002/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BRANAGAN, Daniel, J.
1435 Bone Road
Iona, ID 83427 / US
02 / BURCH, Joseph, V.
725 North 900 East
Shelley, ID 83274 / US
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Lorenz, Werner
Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2-4
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date00936186.622.05.2000
[2002/17]
WO2000US14080
Priority number, dateUS1999031824225.05.1999         Original published format: US 318242
[2005/43]
Former [2002/17]US1999031842425.05.1999
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0071759
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1198605
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2002/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1198605
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1198605
Date:02.11.2005
[N/P]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.05.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C22C45/02, C21D1/06
[2002/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STAHLHERSTELLUNG[2002/17]
English:METHODS OF FORMING STEEL[2002/17]
French:PROCEDES DE FORMATION D'ACIER[2002/17]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2001National basic fee paid 
13.11.2001Search fee paid 
13.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/17]
14.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2005Fee for grant paid
24.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04012846.4  / EP1452617
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006  19.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
DURUM, Verschleiss-Schutz GmbH
Linsellesstrasse 125
D-47877 Willich / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendel, Christian
Haifastrasse 20
40227 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/30]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006  19.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
DURUM, Verschleiss-Schutz GmbH
Linsellesstrasse 125
D-47877 Willich / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendel, Christian
Haifastrasse 20
D-40227 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/51]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006  19.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
DURUM, Verschleiss-Schutz GmbH
Linsellesstrasse 125
D-47877 Willich / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendel, Christian
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Bahnstraße 9
D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/32]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006  19.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
DURUM, Verschleiss-Schutz GmbH
Linsellesstrasse 125
D-47877 Willich / DE
Opponent's representative
LENZING GERBER
Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
40103 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/24]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006   
DURUM, Verschleiss-Schutz GmbH
Linsellesstrasse 125
D-47877 Willich / DE
Opponent's representative
Bendel, Christian
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Bahnstrasse 9
D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE
23.06.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.01.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/19]
Appeal following opposition27.03.2008Appeal received No.  T0862/08
02.06.2008Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
21.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH17.08.2005
LI17.08.2005
[2010/46]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0513385  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, lines 46-53 * * page 4, lines 20-31 * * page 4, lines 43-55 *;
 [X]JPS56163064  ;
 [A]US4405368  (RAY RANJAN [US], et al) [A] 8-10,16,18-20 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 32 *;
 [A]US4881989  (YOSHIZAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH01156452  ;
 [A]US4779802  (COOMBS JEFFREY S [GB]);
 [A]JPH06285595
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820327), vol. 006, no. 048, Database accession no. (M - 119), [X] 14,15,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890914), vol. 013, no. 417, Database accession no. (C - 636), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [A] * abstract *
International search[X]US4576653  (RAY RANJAN [US]);
 [X]JPH01275717  (HITACHI METALS LTD);
 [Y]USRE32925E