blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1098576 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1098576



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 327
27.06.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.04.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.06.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.06.2002 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
06.12.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 31
06.12.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
23.10.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 31
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.08.2001 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.08.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
30.08.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 20
30.08.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.07.2001 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.07.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.07.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.05.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
07.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.05.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
02.05.2001 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 4
04.04.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.04.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.03.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2001 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2001 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.03.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
25.03.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.03.2001 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.03.2001 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.03.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.03.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.02.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.02.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.02.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.02.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
16.02.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.01.2001 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.01.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
17.01.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.12.2000 Priority document Search / examination 6
14.12.2000 Priority document Search / examination 36
07.12.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.11.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.11.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
22.06.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.06.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 6
22.06.2000 Description International Searching Authority 18
22.06.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
22.06.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 5