blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1098576
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1098576Global Dossier 16.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US13530099 21.05.1999
US15984299 15.10.1999
US0014178 22.05.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5156900 12.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US13530099 21.05.1999
US15984299 15.10.1999
US0014178 22.05.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2340124 30.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13530099 21.05.1999
US15984299 15.10.1999
US0014178 22.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0070984Global Dossier 20.06.2002A9
WO0070984 30.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13530099 21.05.1999
US15984299 15.10.1999