Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098576

EP1098576 - CUSTOMIZABLE ORTHOTIC WITH RESILIENT, DYNAMIC SUPPORT AND SIMPLIFIED ADJUSTABLE FOOT CUSHIONING AND SUPPORT SHOE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kellerman Company, LLC
9663 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 830
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLERMAN, David
9663 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 850
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US
02 / TOLWIN, Hindy, Kellerman
9663 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 830
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date00936221.122.05.2000
[2001/20]
WO2000US14178
Priority number, dateUS19990135300P21.05.1999         Original published format: US 135300 P
US19990159842P15.10.1999         Original published format: US 159842 P
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0070984
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098576
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A43B17/02, A43B7/14
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANPASSBARE ORTHOPÄDISCHE SOHLE MIT ELASTISCHEM, DYNAMISCHEM STÜTZSYSTEM UND VEREINFACHTE ANPASSBARE FUSSPOLSTERUNG UND EINLEGESOHLE[2001/20]
English:CUSTOMIZABLE ORTHOTIC WITH RESILIENT, DYNAMIC SUPPORT AND SIMPLIFIED ADJUSTABLE FOOT CUSHIONING AND SUPPORT SHOE INSERT[2001/20]
French:ORTHESE PERSONNALISABLE A SUPPORT ELASTIQUE ET DYNAMIQUE ET GARNITURE INTERIEURE DE CHAUSSURE SIMPLIFIEE, MATELASSEE ET AJUSTABLE AU PIED[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2001National basic fee paid 
16.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
02.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/25]
13.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PDX]US6000147  (KELLERMAN DAVID [US]) [PDX] 1,8,9,11-14,19,21-28 * the whole document *;
 [DXY]US5799414  (KELLERMAN DAVID [US]) [DX] 1,3,9,10,22-26 * figures 17,19 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US5787608  (GREENAWALT KENT S [US]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2312378  (BAUM JOHN D) [X] 1,8 * page 3, column L, line 41 - column R, line 49; figure - *;
 [XA]DE3131163  (ANDRESEN ELFRIEDE A, et al) [X] 1,3,9,10,22-25 * the whole document * [A] 5,6;
 [X]US5438768  (BAUERFEIND HANS B [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5768803  (LEVY DODD M [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 14; figures 2,3 *;
 [DX]US5154682  (KELLERMAN DAVID [US]) [DX] 1,3,9,10,22-25 * figures 6-10 *
by applicantUS5154682
 US5799414
 US6000147
 US5953797