Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100602

EP1100602 - FABRIC-COVERED SPRING TOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poof-Slinky, Inc.
45400 Helm Street, PO Box 701394
Plymouth, Michigan 48170-0964 / US
[2005/13]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
James Industries, Inc.
Beaver Street Extension, Box 407
Hollidaysburg, PA 16648 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YIP, Wing Kay Thomas
2/F., No. 26 To Shek Village
Shatin, New Territories, Hong Kong / CN
 [2001/42]
Former [2001/21]01 / Thomas, Yip Wing Kay
1 Tung Sha Industrial Estat e Fu Shing
Dong Guan Guang Dong 005 / CN
Representative(s)Manaton, Ross Timothy , et al
Bromhead Johnson
57-59 High Street
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Manaton, Ross Timothy , et al
Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London
WC2 6EF / GB
Former [2004/23]Manaton, Ross Timothy , et al
Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Former [2001/21]Manaton, Ross Timothy
JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Application number, filing date00936273.224.05.2000
[2001/21]
WO2000US14336
Priority number, dateUS1999031897726.05.1999         Original published format: US 318977
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0071221
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100602
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100602
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A63H33/00, D05B23/00, A63H9/00, A63H15/00
[2002/51]
Former International [2001/21]A63H33/00, D05B23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWEBEÜBERZOGENES SPIELZEUG MIT FEDERANTRIEB UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2001/21]
English:FABRIC-COVERED SPRING TOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING[2001/21]
French:JOUET ANIME PAR RESSORT ET RECOUVERT DE TISSU, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2001National basic fee paid 
22.01.2001Search fee paid 
22.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2005Fee for grant paid
31.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY24.05.2005
IE24.05.2005
LU24.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2007/27]
Former [2007/26]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY24.05.2005
IE24.05.2005
LU24.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/20]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY24.05.2005
IE24.05.2005
LU06.06.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/08]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
IE24.05.2005
LU06.06.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/25]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
IE24.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US3623263  (FRAMPTON JOHN A) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2246962  (MUZZI PLASTICOS LTD [BR]) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *
International search[X]US1551250  (HENRY BEULAH L);
 [X]US1355799  (BRADISH ARTHUR B);
 [A]US4505687  (MUNRO JOAN C [US]);
 [A]US3410023  (JOSEPH ANELLO);
 [A]US3448539  (HARTPENCE ANDE G)