Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101236

EP1101236 - CAPPED ELECTRIC LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PETERS, Ralph, H.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / VAN DULMEN, Hendrikus, A., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / MANDERS, Wilhelmus, J., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date00936790.517.05.2000
[2001/21]
WO2000EP04715
Priority number, dateEP1999020173201.06.1999         Original published format: EP 99201732
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0074099
Date:07.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101236
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101236
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J5/56
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:GESOCKELTE ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE[2001/21]
English:CAPPED ELECTRIC LAMP[2001/21]
French:AMPOULE ELECTRIQUE A CALOTTE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2001National basic fee paid 
07.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2005Fee for grant paid
03.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2006/35]
Former [2006/18]DE04.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5479066  (WILLEMS JOHANNES J G S A [NL], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line L *;
 [PX]WO9952128  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *