Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103137

EP1103137 - ARRANGING AUTHENTICATION AND CIPHERING IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / EINOLA, Heikki
Kaksoiskiventie 7-9 B 5
FIN-02760 Espoo / FI
02 / MÄKINEN, Teemu
Tanhumäentie 23 B 1
FIN-04420 Järvenpää / FI
03 / EKOLA, Keijo
Lepolankuja 4 C 7
FIN-33900 Tampere / FI
04 / VIRTANEN, Kari, O.
Tohtorinkatu 34 D 17
FIN-33720 Tampere / FI
05 / TAMMI, Kalle
Vernissaraitti 8 A 9
FIN-33720 Tampere / FI
06 / HALMINEN, Harri
Urheilutie 3 B 8
FIN-36200 Kangasala / FI
07 / TERVO, Vesa
Kuusimäenkatu 14
FIN-33560 Tampere / FI
08 / VILPPULA, Matti
Koivutie 16 B 6
FIN-33960 Pirkkala / FI
09 / LINDHOLM, Rune
Mahlarinne 8
FIN-24280 Salo / FI
10 / TIMONEN, Juha, T.
Soirotie 7
FIN-90800 Oulu / FI
11 / SMOLANDER, Jouni
Kievarinkuja 5
FIN-33560 Tampere / FI
 [2008/36]
Former [2001/22]01 / EINOLA, Heikki
Kaksoiskiventie 7-9 B 5
FIN-02760 Espoo / FI
02 / MÄKINEN, Teemu
Tanhumäentie 23 B 1
FIN-04420 Järvenpää / FI
03 / EKOLA, Keijo
Lepolankuja 4 C 7
FIN-33900 Tampere / FI
04 / VIRTANEN, Kari, O.
Tohtorinkatu 34 D 17
FIN-33720 Tampere / FI
05 / TAMMI, Kalle
Vernissaraitti 8 A 9
FIN-33720 Tampere / FI
06 / HALMINEN, Harri
Urheilutie 3 B 8
FIN-36200 Kangasala / FI
07 / TERVO, Vesa
Kuusimäenkatu 14
FIN-33560 Tampere / FI
08 / VILPPULA, Matti
Koivutie 16 B 6
FIN-33960 Pirkkala / FI
09 / LINDHOLM, Rune
Mahlarinne 8
FIN-24280 Salo / FI
10 / TIMONEN, Juha, T.
Soirotie 7
FIN-90800 Oulu / FI
11 / SMOLANDER, Jouni
Pellervonkatu 22 A 13
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
Representative(s)Kaukonen, Juha Veikko , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Kaukonen, Juha Veikko , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00936915.802.06.2000
[2001/22]
WO2000FI00495
Priority number, dateFI1999000128304.06.1999         Original published format: FI 991283
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0076194
Date:14.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103137
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103137
Date:12.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M7/00
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND VERSCHLÜSSELUNG IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2001/22]
English:ARRANGING AUTHENTICATION AND CIPHERING IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2001/22]
French:DISPOSITION D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET DE CHIFFREMENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2001National basic fee paid 
26.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
18.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2008Fee for grant paid
30.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200203   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
CY12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
GR13.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
GR13.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/47]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
GR13.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
IE02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/21]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
IE02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2009/37]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
SE12.02.2009
PT13.04.2009
Former [2009/34]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
DK12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
Former [2009/32]AT12.11.2008
BE12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
Former [2009/25]AT12.11.2008
NL12.11.2008
Former [2009/23]AT12.11.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9859513  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al);
 [AP]  - PUTZ S., SCHMITZ R., "Secure interoperation between 2G and 3G mobile radio networks", FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 4G MOBILE COMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, 2000 (CONF. PUBL. NO. 471), (20000327), pages 28 - 32, ISBN 0-85296-726-8, XP002933937