Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078215

EP1078215 - USE OF METAL FOAMS IN ARMOR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80636 München / DE
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
Fraunhofer, USA, Inc.
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48106-0335 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Chin-Jye
9 Abbey Road
Newark, DE 19702 / US
02 / CLAAR, Terry, Dennis
306 Fashion Circle
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / EIFERT, Harald, Heinrich
46 Quail Hollow Drive
Hockessin, DE 19707 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/51]
Former [2003/17]Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD / GB
Former [2001/09]Denmark, James
Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date00937503.110.03.2000
[2001/09]
WO2000US06220
Priority number, dateUS19990123569P10.03.1999         Original published format: US 123569 P
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0055567
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078215
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078215
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search reportEP21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41H5/04
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON METALLSCHÄUMEN IN PANZERUNGSSYSTEMEN[2001/09]
English:USE OF METAL FOAMS IN ARMOR SYSTEMS[2001/09]
French:UTILISATION DE MOUSSES METALLIQUES DANS DES SYSTEMES DE BLINDAGE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2000National basic fee paid 
08.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2003Fee for grant paid
13.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
IE10.03.2004
LU10.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
PT17.05.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
IE10.03.2004
LU10.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/24]BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
IE10.03.2004
LU10.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/23]BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
LU10.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/02]BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2004/52]BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/33]CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE2039343  (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH) [X] 1,7-9,13,14,18 * figure .; claims 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 2 * [Y] 10-12,15-17;
 [A]DE9007336U  (NEUERO STAHLBAU GMBH & CO) [A] 8,9,13,14,18 * figure 2; claim . *;
 [XDY]US5151246  (BAUMEISTER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 48 - line 50 * * column 5, line 53 - line 61 * * column 7, line 34 - line 42 * [Y] 10-12,15-17;
 [DXA]US4973358  (JIN ILJOON [CA], et al) [DX] 1-6 * table 1 * * column 1, line 11 - line 14 * * column 1, line 34 - line 52 * * column 3, line 40 - line 66 * * column 2, line 16 - line 19 * [A] 4,11,16;
 [XDA]US5181549  (SHAPOVALOV VLADIMIR I [SU]) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 6, line 62 - line 68 * [A] 4,11,16;
 [A]US3604374  (MATSON HAROLD E, et al) [A] 8,9,13,14,18 * figures 3,3A * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 17 *
by applicantUS5151246
 US4973358
 US5181549