Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1198769

EP1198769 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING TRAVEL SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / SILVERBROOK, Kia
Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
02 / LAPSTUN, Jacqueline, Anne
13 Duke Avenue
Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU
03 / LAPSTUN, Paul
13 Duke Avenue
Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2006/49]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2002/17]Musker, David Charles , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date00938337.330.06.2000
[2002/17]
WO2000AU00768
Priority number, dateAU1999PP0131330.06.1999         Original published format: AU PP131399
AU1999PP0131230.06.1999         Original published format: AU PP131299
AU1999PP0491224.12.1999         Original published format: AU PP491299
[2002/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0103018
Date:11.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1198769
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001
[2002/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1198769
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU11.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06F15/02
[2007/44]
Former International [2004/33]G06F17/60, G06F15/02
Former International [2002/17]G06F17/60, // G06F153:02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/17]
Extension statesAL29.01.2002
LT29.01.2002
LV29.01.2002
MK29.01.2002
RO29.01.2002
SI29.01.2002
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF REISEDIENSTEN.[2002/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING TRAVEL SERVICES[2002/17]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ACCES A DES SERVICES DE VOYAGES[2002/17]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2002National basic fee paid 
29.01.2002Search fee paid 
29.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
29.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2007
13.09.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.09.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
02.05.2008Fee for grant paid
02.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
02.05.2008Request for further processing filed
02.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
19.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
CY18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
IT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
CH30.06.2008
LI30.06.2008
LU30.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
GR19.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/34]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
CY18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
IT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
CH30.06.2008
LI30.06.2008
LU30.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2010/32]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
IT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
CH30.06.2008
LI30.06.2008
LU30.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/39]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
IT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
CH30.06.2008
LI30.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/30]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
CH30.06.2008
LI30.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/20]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
DK18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/12]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/09]AT18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
ES29.09.2008
PT18.11.2008
Former [2009/07]AT18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
MC30.06.2008
SE18.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
Former [2008/49]AT18.06.2008
FI18.06.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9722959  (SEKENDUR ORAL [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]US5661506  (LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 24 * * column 7, line 22 - line 31 *;
 [X]US5640193  (WELLNER PIERRE DAVID [US]) [X] 1-9,18-38,40-45 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 18 - line 26 * * column 6, line 17 - line 51 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]WO9919823  (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,18-28,31,32,34-38 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 3 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 25 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 35 * * page 20, line 1 - line 10 *;
 [A]US5311425  (INADA TAKAYA [JP]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5640193  (WELLNER PIERRE DAVID [US]);
 [Y]US5311425  (INADA TAKAYA [JP]);
 [AP]WO9950787  (XEROX CORP [US], et al)