Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097068

EP1097068 - ACTUATOR PEDAL FOR THE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A ROAD VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.06.2008  [2008/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG
Postfach 1220
49441 Lemförde / DE
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / ERSOY, Metin
Eichenweg 1 a
D-65396 Walluf / DE
02 / ROGOWSKI, Waldemar
Rheiner Landstrasse 30
D-49078 Osnabrück / DE
03 / WAGENER, Keit
Gradweg 4
D-49143 Bissendorf / DE
 [2001/19]
Application number, filing date00938526.103.05.2000
[2001/19]
WO2000DE01371
Priority number, dateDE199912155211.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19921552
[2001/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0068050
Date:16.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097068
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097068
Date:18.07.2007
Language:DE
[2007/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T7/06, G05G1/14
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:BETÄTIGUNGSPEDAL FÜR DIE BREMSANLAGE EINES STRASSENFAHRZEUGES[2001/19]
English:ACTUATOR PEDAL FOR THE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A ROAD VEHICLE[2001/19]
French:PEDALE D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR LE SYSTEME DE FREINAGE D'UN VEHICULE ROUTIER[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2001National basic fee paid 
05.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
26.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2007Fee for grant paid
20.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0788954  (DURA AUTOMOTIVE SYST INC [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-7 *;
 [YA]US4009623  (SMITH GROVER C, et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-8 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0704333  (SYSTECO SA [FR]);
 [A]DE3427097  (GERCKEN KARL);
 [A]US4404439  (LEIGHTON JOHN D [US])