EP1102722 - METHOD FOR DISPERSING INSOLUBLE MINERAL SEDIMENTS AND ADDITIVES FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbst, Jürgen Otto-Hahn-Strasse 6 48291 Telgte / DE | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 00938734.1 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/22] | WO2000EP05062 | Priority number, date | DE1999209819U | 05.06.1999 Original published format: DE 29909819 U | DE1999212836U | 22.07.1999 Original published format: DE 29912836 U | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075079 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102722 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28, A61K9/00 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
A61K33/06 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K9/0007 (EP);
A61K9/2009 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
C02F1/5236 (EP);
C02F1/54 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DISPERGIEREN VON UNLÖSLICHEN MINERALISCHEN SEDIMENTEN SOWIE ADDITIVE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2001/22] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPERSING INSOLUBLE MINERAL SEDIMENTS AND ADDITIVES FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD | [2001/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISPERSION DE SEDIMENTS MINERAUX INSOLUBLES ET ADDITIFS DESTINES A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4004036 (W.H.SCHMITT) [Y] 1-18 * example - *; | [Y]JPS63310807 ; | [Y]JPH05139906 ; | [X]JPH0597604 ; | [X]JPH04273802 ; | [A]GB1075470 (MILES LABORATORIES) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4133889 (N.BECKER) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US5071587 (C.A.PERMAN) [A] 1-18 * claim - * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 05, Database accession no. 1989-036759, XP002147561 & JPS63310807 A 19881219 ((KANE)KANEBO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 27, Database accession no. 1993-216605, XP002147562 & JPH05139906 A 19930608 ((HOKK)HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 20, Database accession no. 1993-164300, XP002147563 & JPH0597604 A 19930420 ((HOKK) HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 46, Database accession no. 1992-375602, XP002147564 & JPH04273802 A 00000000 ((NIPS)NIPPON SODA CO) [X] 1 * abstract * |