Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103119

EP1103119 - METHOD OF, AND A HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK FOR, TRANSMITTING DATA PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BAKER, Matthew, P., J.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / EILLEY, Edward, S.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2001/22]Scott, Kevin James
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date00938747.302.06.2000
[2001/22]
WO2000EP05105
Priority number, dateGB1999001326008.06.1999         Original published format: GB 9913260
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0076141
Date:14.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103119
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND HETEROGENEN NETZWERK ZUM ÜBERTRAGES VON DATENPAKETEN[2001/22]
English:METHOD OF, AND A HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK FOR, TRANSMITTING DATA PACKETS[2001/22]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES ET RESEAU HETEROGENE DESTINE A CETTE TRANSMISSION[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2001National basic fee paid 
15.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
03.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/34]
04.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0847220  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 22 *;
 [A]EP0825784  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0738061  (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] * the whole document *