Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099277

EP1099277 - ANTENNA DEVICE FOR MOBILE TELEPHONY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Libertel Netwerk B.V.
Avenue Ceramique 300
6221 KX Maastricht / NL
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER MAST, Hendricus, Leonards, Maria
Augustinusstraat 39
NL-6169 AJ Geleen / NL
02 / WITTE, Johannes, Hendricus
Ertskade 83
NL-1019 BB Amsterdam / NL
03 / KOUTERS, Lucas, Johannes, Cornelis
Zuiderkeerkring 290
NL-2408 TJ Alphen aan de Rijn / NL
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00939193.908.06.2000
[2001/20]
WO2000NL00389
Priority number, dateNL1999101228109.06.1999         Original published format: NL 1012281
[2001/20]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0076025
Date:14.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099277
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01Q3/06, H01Q1/12, H01Q1/24
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2001/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTENNENEINRICHTUNG FÜR MOBILES TELEFONSYSTEM[2001/20]
English:ANTENNA DEVICE FOR MOBILE TELEPHONY[2001/20]
French:SYSTEME D'ANTENNE POUR TELEPHONIE MOBILE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2000Translation filed 
07.03.2001National basic fee paid 
07.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
10.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/43]
23.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9848472  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 9; figure 4 * [Y] 4,10;
 [XA]FR2745423  (PINGON MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, lines 31-37; figure 9 * [A] 4,13;
 [Y]WO9857191  (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [Y] 4,10 * page 5, lines 3-27; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9733339  (CUE DEE PRODUKTER AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 22; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5440318  (BUTLAND ROGER J [NZ], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 31-37; figure 9 *