Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1211926

EP1211926 - METHOD FOR BREEDING TOMATOES HAVING REDUCED WATER CONTENT AND PRODUCT OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 25.06.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2015New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE
Volcani Research Center P.O. Box 6
IL-50 250 Beit Dagan / IL
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE
Volcani Research Center P.O. Box 6
IL-50 250 Beit Dagan / IL
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAFFER, Arthur
16 Hazait Street
73127 Hashmonaim / IL
[2002/24]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/04]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/24]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date00940724.804.07.2000
[2002/24]
WO2000IL00389
Priority number, dateIL1999013150919.08.1999         Original published format: IL 13150999
[2002/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0113708
Date:01.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1211926
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001
[2002/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1211926
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP01.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/10, A01H1/04
[2002/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZUCHT VON TOMATEN MIT NIEDRIGEM WASSERGEHALT UND PRODUKT DIESES VERFAHRENS[2002/24]
English:METHOD FOR BREEDING TOMATOES HAVING REDUCED WATER CONTENT AND PRODUCT OF THE METHOD[2002/24]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CULTIVER DES TOMATES AYANT UNE TENEUR EN EAU REDUITE ET PRODUIT OBTENU AU MOYEN DE CE PROCEDE[2002/24]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2002National basic fee paid 
08.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
03.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
01.11.2011Observations by third parties
04.11.2011Observations by third parties
21.11.2011Observations by third parties
08.12.2011Observations by third parties
14.02.2012Observations by third parties
07.03.2012Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2004  30.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Tjon, Hon Kong Guno
Unilever N.V.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [2015/21]
Former [2004/41]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2004   
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Tjon Tien Ril, Hon Kong Guno
Unilever N.V., Patent Department P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
01.10.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.04.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
03.04.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.05.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition08.08.2006Appeal received No.  T1242/06
29.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
07.08.2006Appeal received No.  T1242/06
29.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
19.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
27.09.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
08.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:26.09.2003Request for further processing filed
29.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
PT26.04.2004
LU04.07.2004
IE05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]AT26.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
LU04.07.2004
IE05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/24]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
LU04.07.2004
IE05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
LU04.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2004/41]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE26.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]  DATABASE CAB [Online] CAB INTERNATIONAL, WALLINGFORD, OXON, GB; an 86:68394, 1984 GOLIAS, J.: "Resistance of tomato cultivars to fruit cracking " XP002149829
 [AD]  DATABASE BIOSIS [Online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; August 1998 (1998-08) BERNACCHI D ET AL: "Advanced backcross QTL analysis in tomato. I. Identification of QTLS for traits of agronomic importance from Lycopersicon hirsutum." Database accession no. PREV199800480218 XP002149830 cited in the application & THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, vol. 97, no. 3, August 1998 (1998-08), pages 381-397, ISSN: 0040-5752
other   - Deutscher Bundestag, Antrag der Fraktionen CDU/CSU, SPD, FDP und BÜNDNIS 90/DIE GRÜNEN. Drucksache 17/8344 XP003030402