Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1211926


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2019 Change - classification published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
03.08.2018 Revocation of patent published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
17.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
09.02.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
12.09.2017 New entry: Observations by third parties
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
15.06.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
31.05.2017 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
31.05.2017 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
05.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
09.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
16.09.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
10.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015 Change: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
07.09.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
25.06.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2014 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.03.2012 New entry: Observations by third parties
15.02.2012 New entry: Observations by third parties
13.12.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
22.11.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
14.11.2011 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
03.11.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
22.03.2011 Change: Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2011 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
26.01.2008 Deletion: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
14.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2008  [2008/03]
25.09.2007 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
25.09.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.06.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2007 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.01.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2007  [2007/08]
04.11.2006 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
22.08.2006 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.08.2006 Change: Appeal number
09.08.2006 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
24.05.2006 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
30.03.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2005 Change - representative published on  25.01.2006  [2006/04]
09.06.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
15.04.2005 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
21.01.2005 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.09.2004 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
20.08.2004 Opposition filed published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
17.08.2004 Unpublished change to opponent data
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
07.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.06.2004  [2004/26]
23.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
10.10.2003 (Expected) grant published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
04.10.2003 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
04.10.2003 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
04.10.2003 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
16.09.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.10.2002 Change - extension states
24.07.2002 Renewal fee
26.04.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.06.2002  [2002/24]
26.04.2002 Request for examination filed published on  12.06.2002  [2002/24]
08.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
04.05.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication