blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1211926
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015067911Global Dossier 05.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
US50689606 21.08.2006
US6938902 27.06.2002
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
US201414538835 12.11.2014
US63688009 14.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007022504Global Dossier 25.01.2007A1
Priority number Date
US50689606 21.08.2006
US6938902 27.06.2002
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8895817Global Dossier 25.11.2014B2
US2010095393 15.04.2010A1
Priority number Date
US50689606 21.08.2006
US6938902 27.06.2002
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
US63688009 14.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003507044Global Dossier 25.02.2003A
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1211926Global Dossier 26.11.2003B1
EP1211926 12.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT254836T 15.12.2003T
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU781883C 09.02.2006C
AU781883B 16.06.2005B2
AU5562200 19.03.2001A
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382191 14.01.2014C
CA2382191 01.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60006829T 23.09.2004T2
DE60006829D 08.01.2004D1
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7119261 10.10.2006B1
Priority number Date
IL0000389 04.07.2000
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0113708Global Dossier 01.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2011200239Global Dossier 13.10.2011A
Priority number Date
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1269396C 16.08.2006C
CN1390090 08.01.2003A
Priority number Date
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2211562T 16.07.2004T3
Priority number Date
IL13150999 19.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL131509 08.03.2007A
IL131509D 20.05.2001D0
Priority number Date
IL13150999 19.08.1999