blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1211926

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 26.11.2003
 BELapse: 31.07.2016
 CHLapse: 31.07.2016
CYLapse: 26.11.2003
 DELapse: 01.02.2017
 DKLapse: 26.02.2004
 ESLapse: 05.07.2016
 FILapse: 26.11.2003
 FRLapse: 01.08.2016
 GBLapse: 04.07.2016
 GRLapse: 07.02.2017
 IELapse: 05.07.2004
 ITLapse: 04.07.2016
 LILapse: 31.07.2016
 LULapse: 04.07.2004
 MCLapse: 31.07.2004
 NLLapse: 01.08.2016
 PTLapse: 26.04.2004
 SELapse: 26.02.2004
Examination procedure08.09.2017Observations by third parties
Entry into regional phase08.03.2002National basic fee paid 
08.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted26.11.2003
Opposition procedure28.04.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 05.09.2018 
Appeal following opposition08.08.2006APPEAL FILED
29.09.2006APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
08.12.2015APPEAL RESULT
07.08.2006APPEAL FILED
29.09.2006APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
08.12.2015APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020308
 
Event date:12.06.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20031126
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20031126
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20031126
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:28.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:08.01.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60006829
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040108
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:14.01.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:26.02.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040226
 
Event date:26.02.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040226
 
Event date:19.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20040400653 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:25.05.2004 
Event description:LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION
Effective DATE:20031126
 
Event date:04.07.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040704
 
Event date:05.07.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040705
 
Event date:15.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:16.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2211562 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:31.07.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040731
 
Event date:24.09.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:06.10.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:UNILEVER N.V.
Effective DATE:20040812
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:UNILEVER N.V.
 
Event date:06.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.10.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE
Free Format Text:STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE#VOLCANI RESEARCH CENTER P.O. BOX 6#IL-50 250 BEIT DAGAN (IL) -TRANSFER TO- STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE#VOLCANI RESEARCH CENTER P.O. BOX 6#IL-50 250 BEIT DAGAN (IL)
 
Event date:02.01.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040426
 
Event date:20.05.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Effective DATE:20040812
 
Event date:30.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.09.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20150825
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20150731
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20150731
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.12.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20150730
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160731
 
Event date:01.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 60006829 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:01.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160801
 
Event date:22.03.2017 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160704
 
Event date:12.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR ML 20040400653 GR
Code Expl.:-LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20170207
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170207
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160801
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160731
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160731
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170201
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160801
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20170331
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160704
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160704
 
Event date:28.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R103 60006829 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT REVOKED BY EPO
 
Event date:28.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R064 60006829 DE
Code Expl.:-EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160705
 
Event date:05.09.2018 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20180428
 
Event date:12.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160731
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01H 5/10 20180101AFI20010308BHEP
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01H 1/04 20060101ALI20010308BHEP