Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1111830

EP1111830 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TODA, Takashi
4-90, Shinjo, Nonoichi-machi
Ishikawa-gun, Ishikawa 921-8824 / JP
02 / MINAMIDA, Noriaki
1-182-1, Matsumura
Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 920-0901 / JP
03 / ARAMAKI, Yoshitaka
6-2-105, Hikari no Oka
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00942381.529.06.2000
[2001/26]
WO2000JP04271
Priority number, dateJP1999019146706.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19146799
[2001/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0103348
Date:11.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1111830
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001
[2001/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/04, H03L7/14, H03J7/02
[2002/39]
Former International [2001/26]H04J13/04, H03L7/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2001/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSEN EMPFANG[2001/26]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS RECEPTION[2001/26]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECEPTION SANS FIL[2001/26]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2001Translation filed 
01.03.2001National basic fee paid 
01.03.2001Search fee paid 
01.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
28.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5488629  (TAKAHASHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 24, line 31 - line 57; figure 16B *;
 [A]US5422917  (SCOTT KENNETH E [CA])
International search[X]JPH1141068  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [X]JPH07123125  (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [X]JPH07297779  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH10126310  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH05206849  (NEC CORP);
 [A]JPH0983360  (HITACHI CABLE);
 [AP]JP2000209128  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)