Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1200839

EP1200839 - AUTOMATED LABORATORY SOFTWARE ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
[2019/24]
Former [2012/42]For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
Former [2010/26]For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, 92821 CA / US
Former [2006/52]For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
4300 N. Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92834 / US
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Coulter International Corp.
Mail Code 32-A02, 11800 S.W. 147 Avenue
Miami, Florida 33196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARYEV, Michael
4190 Staghorn Lane
Weston, FL 33331 / US
02 / KRENSKY, Andrea, L.
9010 SW 125 Avenue 203
Miami, FL 33186 / US
03 / HULS, Fredric, W.
2741 SW 179 Avenue
Miramar, FL 33029 / US
04 / GARCIA, Gerardo
1627 Brickell Avenue 1001
Miami, FL 33129 / US
05 / QIN, Bin
3880 Falcon Ridge Circle
Weston, FL 33331 / US
06 / ROACH, David, J.
720 Southwind Circle
Sunrise, FL 33326 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2002/27]01 / ARYEV, Michael
4190 Staghorn Lane
Weston, FL 33331 / US
02 / KRENSKY, Andrea, L.
9010 SW 125 Avenue 203
Miami, FL 33186 / US
03 / HULS, Fredric, W.
2741 SW 179 Avenue
Miramar, FL 33029 / US
04 / GARCIA, Gerardo
1627 Brickell Avenue # 1001
Miami, FL 33129 / US
05 / QIN, Bin
3880 Falcon Ridge Circle
Weston, FL 33331 / US
06 / ROACH, David, J.
720 Southwind Circle
Sunrise, FL 33326 / US
Former [2002/18]01 / ARYEV, Michael
4190 Staghorn Lane
Weston, FL 33331 / US
02 / KRENSKY, Andrea, L.
9010 SW 125 Avenue 203
Miami, FL 33186 / US
03 / HULS, Fredric, W.
2741 SW 179 Avenue
Miramar, FL 33029 / US
04 / GARCIA, Gerardo
1420 Brickell Bay Drive 207
Miami, FL 33131 / US
05 / QIN, Bin
3880 Falcon Ridge Circle
Weston, FL 33331 / US
06 / ROACH, David, J.
720 Southwind Circle
Sunrise, FL 33326 / US
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/24]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2011/01]Spencer, Matthew Peter , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/17]Lord, Michael , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2002/18]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date00943418.407.07.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000US18753
Priority number, dateUS1999036460230.07.1999         Original published format: US 364602
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0109618
Date:08.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1200839
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1200839
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1200839
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06Q50/22, G01N35/00, G05B19/418
[2015/29]
Former International [2002/18]G01N35/00, G05B19/418
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2019/24]
Former [2004/20]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2002/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTE LABOR-SOFTWARE-ARCHITEKTUR[2002/18]
English:AUTOMATED LABORATORY SOFTWARE ARCHITECTURE[2002/18]
French:ARCHITECTURE LOGICIELLE POUR LABORATOIRE AUTOMATISE[2002/18]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2002National basic fee paid 
28.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
19.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2012Fee for grant paid
05.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  WITHDRAWN
CABINET NUSS
10 rue Jacques Kablé
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
 02  26.01.2018  31.01.2018  INTERVENTION
Sysmex Deutschland GmbH
Bornbarch 1
22848 Norderstedt / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2019/02]
Former [2018/10]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
CABINET NUSS
10 rue Jacques Kablé
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
 02  26.01.2018  31.01.2018  INTERVENTION
Sysmex Deutschland GmbH
Bornbarch 1
22848 Norderstedt / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
CABINET NUSS
10 rue Jacques Kablé
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
CABINET NUSS
10 rue Jacques Kablé
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Nuss, Laurent
Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
23.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.08.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.08.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.12.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.02.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.05.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition09.10.2015Appeal received No.  T1991/15
10.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
28.01.2009Appeal received No.  T0813/09
06.04.2009Statement of grounds filed
29.03.2012Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Request for further processing for:10.11.2006Request for further processing filed
10.11.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.11.2006Decision despatched
26.05.2005Request for further processing filed
27.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[A]US5437838  (DEMORANVILLE VICTORIA E ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 59 - column 11, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US5757659  (ARAI TOYOFUMI ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column 5, line 26 - column 22, line 65; figure - *;
 [A]US5555179  (KOYAMA MASAHIRO ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 40 - column 15, line 65; figure - *;
 [A]US5614415  (MARKIN RODNEY S) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 57; figure - *;
 [A]US5631844  (SAVORY JOHN ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column 5, line 60 - column 193, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]EP0596205  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [A] 1-21 * page 6, line 15 - page 28, line 28; figure - *;
 [A]US5610069  (CLARK FREDERICK L ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column 10, line 65 - column 67, line 35; figure - *
 [A]  - SMITH J ET AL, "ABBOTT AXSYMTM TANDOM AND CONTINUOUS ACCESS IMMUNOASSAY SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED WORKFLOW IN THE CLINICAL LABORATORY", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, (19931001), vol. 39, no. 10, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 2063 - 2069, XP000413807 [A] 1-21 * page 2063 - page 2069 *
OppositionUS5351801
 EP0871035
 WO9415219
    - Rechenberger, Pomberger, Informatik-Handbuch, Carl Hanser Verlag, (19970000), pages 419-441,556-589,650 - 653, XP055456766
    - JAMES C. BOYD et al., "Robotics and the changing face of the clinical laboratory", Clinical Chemistry, (19961200), vol. 42, no. 12, pages 1901 - 191 0, XP055456746
    - MARTIN A. HUNT et al., "Development testing of the chemical analysis automation polychlorinated biphenyl standard analysis method during surface soils sampling at the David Witherspoon 1630 site", Technical Report ORNL/TM-13590, (19980200), XP055456755

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2172/582249
    - MARC L. SALIT et al., "Integrating Automated Systems with Modular Architecture", Analytical Chemistry, (19940315), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 361A - 367A, XP055456759
    - Sysmex, "System-Controller for blood tests LASC-HST", Operational manual, (19981100), XP055456771
    - GRIMSON, W. ET AL, "Specifying an open clinical laboratory information system", Computer Methods and Programs in Biomedicine, (19960701), vol. 50, pages 95 - 109, XP 055192882
    - WADE, ET AL, "Managing the operation of open distributed laboratory information systems", Computer Methods and Programs in Biomedicine, (19960701), pages 123 - 133, XP 055146998