Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237432

EP1237432 - CAP WITH STRETCHABLE BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uni-Fit Headwear PTY Ltd.
212 Greenhill Road
Eastwood, S.A. 5063 / AU
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HIGGS, Michael
212 Greenhill Road
Eastwood, S.A. 5063 / AU
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Köchling, Conrad-Joachim
Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB
Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Köchling, Conrad-Joachim
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date00943469.714.07.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000AU00847
Priority number, dateAU1999PQ0163414.07.1999         Original published format: AU PQ163499
AU2000PQ0574118.02.2000         Original published format: AU PQ574100
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0105259
Date:25.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237432
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237432
Date:23.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU25.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:A42B1/22, A42C5/00, A42C5/02
[2005/22]
Former International [2002/37]A42B1/22, A42C5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MÜTZE MIT DEHNBAREM BAND[2002/37]
English:CAP WITH STRETCHABLE BAND[2002/37]
French:CASQUETTE A BANDE EXTENSIBLE[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2002National basic fee paid 
24.05.2002Search fee paid 
09.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
09.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
04.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2008Fee for grant paid
06.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
20.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200304   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/34]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2010/32]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
LU14.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/39]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/34]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE14.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/30]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/18]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/14]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/08]AT23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES03.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US5822799  (KEPPLE JEFFREY L [US]) [A] 1,2,11-20,23 * column 1, line 32 - line 59 * * column 2, line 34 - line 53 * * column 3, line 16 - line 32 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 67 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3309713  (KAUFMAN THEODORE M) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 35 - line 48 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5313668  (BOGAN JEFFERY F [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 9 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4856116  (SULLIVAN LLOYD S [US]);
 [A]US4630317  (BROWN LARRY L [US], et al)
International search[A]WO9513713  (MOORE GARY [US]);
 [A]WO9501738  (STARTER CORP [US]);
 [A]US5428843  (CLOWERS J MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5724675  (LIPKIN CHARLES A [US], et al)