blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1190447

EP1190447 - TRENCH MOS-TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
[2010/22]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LARIK, Joost
Mitterfeldring 118
D-85586 Poing / DE
02 / HIRLER, Franz
Mozartstrasse 4
D-84424 Isen / DE
03 / KOTEK, Manfred
Ossiacherzeile 52
A-9500 Villach / AT
04 / PFIRSCH, Frank
Säbenerstrasse 230
D-81545 München / DE
 [2002/28]
Former [2002/13]01 / LARIK, Joost
Mitterfeldring 118
D-85586 Poing / DE
02 / HIRLER, Franz
Mozartstrasse 4
D-84424 Isen / DE
03 / KOTEK, Manfred
Ossiacherzeile 52
A-9500 Villach / AT
04 / PFIRSCH, Frank
Willroiderstrasse 8A
D-81545 München / DE
Representative(s)Kottmann, Heinz Dieter
Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]Kottmann, Heinz Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00943662.730.05.2000
[2002/13]
WO2000DE01772
Priority number, dateDE199912917525.06.1999         Original published format: DE 19929175
[2002/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0101484
Date:04.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1190447
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1190447
Date:16.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01L29/78, H01L29/36, H01L29/10, H01L29/423
[2009/11]
CPC:
H01L29/1095 (EP,US); H01L29/7813 (EP,US); H01L29/42368 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2002/13]H01L23/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRENCH-MOS-TRANSISTOR[2002/13]
English:TRENCH MOS-TRANSISTOR[2002/13]
French:TRANSISTOR MOS A TRANCHEE[2002/13]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2001National basic fee paid 
05.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.12.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/25]
03.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2009Fee for grant paid
30.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
18.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
14.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US4914058  (BLANCHARD RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 34; figures 3,4A-4J,9A-9B *;
 [DY]US4941026  (TEMPLE VICTOR A K [US]) [DY] 1-11 * column 9, line 20 - column 14, line 48; figure 2A *;
 [DY]US5072266  (BULUCEA CONSTANTIN [US], et al) [DY] 1-11 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 36; figures 2A,2B,8 * * column 8, line 24 - line 63; figures 11,12 * * column 11, line 24 - column 12, line 37; figures 22A-24B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.