blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1185161

EP1185161 - OIL FROM SEEDS WITH A MODIFIED FATTY ACID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 21.09.2011  [2011/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS
Instituto de la Grasa 6
Avda Padre Garcia Tejero 4
41012 Sevilla / ES
[N/P]
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Cientificas
Instituto de la Grasa 6, Avda Padre Garcia Tejero 4
41012 Sevilla / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MARTINEZ-FORCE, Enrique
Lamarque de Novoa 9, 3oA
E-41008 Sevilla / ES
02 / PEREZ-VICH, Begona
Calle Cuidad Aljarafe 24, 3a-2
E-41926 Mairena del Aljarafe / ES
03 / FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ, José Maria
Calle Teruel 10, 3o-3
E-14012 Córdoba / ES
04 / GARCES, Rafael
Calle Dinamarca, 9
E-41907 Valencia de la Concepción / ES
 [2011/38]
Former [2002/11]01 / MARTINEZ-FORCE, Enrique
Lamarque de Novoa 9, 3oA
E-41008 Sevilla / ES
02 / PEREZ-VICH, Begona
Calle Cuidad Aljarafe 24, 3a-2
E-41926 Mairena del Aljarafe / ES
03 / FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ, José Maria
Calle Teruel 10, 3o-3
E-14012 C®rdoba / ES
04 / GARCES, Rafael
Calle Dinamarca, 9
E-41907 Valencia de la Concepci®n / ES
Representative(s)van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2002/11]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00943766.605.06.2000
[2002/11]
WO2000EP05149
Priority number, dateUS1999032650004.06.1999         Original published format: US 326500
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0074469
Date:14.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1185161
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1185161
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1185161
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationIPC:A01H5/10, A23D9/00
[2002/11]
CPC:
A23D9/00 (EP,US); A01H5/10 (EP,US); A01H6/1464 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/11]
TitleGerman:AUS SAATEN GEWONNENES ÖL MIT MODIFIZIERTER FETTSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2002/11]
English:OIL FROM SEEDS WITH A MODIFIED FATTY ACID COMPOSITION[2002/11]
French:HUILE PROVENANT DE GRAINES A TENEUR EN ACIDES GRAS MODIFIEE[2002/11]
Entry into regional phase31.12.2001National basic fee paid 
31.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2004Fee for grant paid
20.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e.V.
Grosse Elbstrasse 39
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB, et al, et al
Brienner Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/23]
Opponent(s)01  24.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e.V.
Grosse Elbstrasse 39
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS München, et al, et al
St.-Anna-Strasse 15
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/29]
Opponent(s)01  24.05.2005  09.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Greenpeace e.V.
Grosse Elbstrasse 39
22767 Hamburg / DE
07.07.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.01.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.05.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.05.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.05.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.07.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.11.2007Appeal received No.  T1854/07
17.01.2008Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2010Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.05.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9520313  (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [AD] 1 * claim -; table - *;
 [AD]US5710366  (COLE GLENN S [US], et al) [AD] 1 * claim -; table - *;
 [A]  - AGGARWAL M ET AL, "The effect of Cd-2+ on lipid components of sunflower (Helianthus annuus L.) seeds.", PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION (DORDRECHT), (1995), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0921-9668, pages 149 - 155, XP000952476 [A] 1,13,16,20,22-28 * tables 2-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01089264
 [A]  - OSORIO J ET AL, "MUTANT SUNFLOWERS WITH HIGH CONCENTRATION OF SATURATED FATTY ACIDS IN THE OIL", CROP SCIENCE,US,CROP SCIENCE SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MADISON, WI, (1995), vol. 35, ISSN 0011-183X, pages 739 - 742, XP000677842 [A] 1,13,16,20,22-28 * table 1 *
 [A]  - MARTINEZ-FORCE ENRIQUE ET AL, "Enzymatic characterisation of high-palmitic acid sunflower (Helianthus annuus L.) mutants.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199902), Database accession no. PREV199900194881, XP002150054 [A] 1,13,16,20,22-28 * abstract *
    [ ] - PLANTA (BERLIN), (199902), vol. 207, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 533 - 538
 [AD]  - RESKE JOHANNA ET AL, "Triacylglycerol composition and structure in genetically modified sunflower and soybean oils.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1997), Database accession no. PREV199799705973, XP002150055 [AD] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1997), vol. 74, no. 8, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 989 - 998
 [A]  - FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ J M ET AL, "Sunflower mutant containing high levels of palmitic acid in high oleic background.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 1998-03-n0113, XP002150056 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - EUPHYTICA 1997 INST. DE AGRIC. SOSTENIBLE, CSIC, APDO. 4084, 14080 CORDOBA, SPAIN, vol. 97, no. 1, pages 113 - 116
by applicantUS4627192
 WO9520313
 WO9639804
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.