Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1188269

EP1188269 - APPARATUS FOR ENCODING A TRANSPORT FORMAT COMBINATION INDICATOR FOR A CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING/DECODING TRANSPORT FORMAT COMBINATION INDICATOR IN CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
[2004/18]
StatusThe patent has been limited
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL
published on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[2014/17]
Former [2004/42]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jae-Yoel
Sanpon 9-danji
Baekdu Apt. 960-1401 Sanpon 2-dong
Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-042 / KR
02 / KANG, Hee-Won
1499, Myonmok 7-dong
Chungnang-gu
Seoul 131-207 / KR
 [2014/17]
Former [2002/12]01 / KIM, Jae-Yoel
Sanpon 9-danji, Baekdu Apt. 960-1401 Sanpon 2-dong
Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-042 / KR
02 / KANG, Hee-Won
1499, Myonmok 7-dong, Chungnang-gu
Seoul 131-207 / KR
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/17]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2002/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00944446.406.07.2000
[2002/12]
WO2000KR00731
Priority number, dateKR1999002793206.07.1999         Original published format: KR 9927932
[2002/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0103366
Date:11.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1188269
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1188269
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Type: B3 Limited patent 
No.:EP1188269
Date:23.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/06, H04B1/707, H04J11/00
[2002/38]
Former International [2002/12]H04L9/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/12]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG EINES TRANSPORTFORMATINDIKATORS FÜR EIN MOBILES CDMA KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2014/17]
English:APPARATUS FOR ENCODING A TRANSPORT FORMAT COMBINATION INDICATOR FOR A CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2014/17]
French:APPAREIL DE CODAGE D'UN INDICATEUR DE COMBINAISON DE FORMAT DE TRANSPORT POUR UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE AMRC[2014/17]
Former [2002/12]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG/DEKODIERUNG EINES TRANSPORTFORMATINDIKATORS IN EINEM CDMA-MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2002/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING/DECODING TRANSPORT FORMAT COMBINATION INDICATOR IN CDMA MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Former [2002/12]APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE/DECODAGE D'UN INDICATEUR DE COMBINAISON DE FORMAT DE TRANSPORT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE AMRC
Entry into regional phase04.01.2002National basic fee paid 
04.01.2002Search fee paid 
04.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
04.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
20.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
07.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2004Fee for grant paid
10.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04016724.9  / EP1475911
EP04016728.0  / EP1475912
EP04016750.4  / EP1475913
EP10006880.8  / EP2242192
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Limitations:03.01.2014Date of receipt of request for limitation
 admissible
03.03.2014Communication of intention to limit the patent
11.03.2014Fee for printing patent specification after limitation
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.07.2005
[2015/36]
Former [2015/21]NL13.10.2004
CY06.07.2005
Former [2014/50]NL13.10.2004
CY06.07.2005
Former [2007/20]CY06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1104130  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1,11,16,19,24,30,35,38 * abstract * * page 2, line 43 - page 5, line 45 *
 [A]  - "UMTS TERRESTRIAL RADIO ACCESS NETWORK (UTRAN); UTRA FDD, MULTIPLEXING, CHANNEL CODING AND INTERLEAVING DESCRIPTION", ETSI, UMTS XX.04 V1.0.0, (19990201), pages 1 - 16, URL: www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/TSG_RAN/ TSGR_02/Docs/pdfs/RP-99026.pdf, (20020715), XP002206095 [A] 1,11,16,19,24,30,35,38,43,48,53,57,61,64,67 * the whole document *
International search[A]KR990015261  ;
 [YP]KR990075942  ;
 [YP]KR990076303  ;
 [AP]KR20000031698  (LG ELECTRONICS INC);
 [A]EP0565506  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US])