Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1187541

EP1187541 - A TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Solanki, Sanjay Amratlal
46 Wilson Road, Englefield Green
Egham, Surrey TW20 0QB / GB
 [2002/12]
Representative(s)Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane, Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2002/12]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date00944634.509.06.2000
[2002/12]
WO2000US15901
Priority number, dateGB1999001371714.06.1999         Original published format: GB 9913717
[2002/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0076369
Date:21.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1187541
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1187541
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A46B9/06
[2002/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINE ZAHNBÜRSTE[2002/12]
English:A TOOTHBRUSH[2002/12]
French:BROSSE A DENTS[2002/12]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2001National basic fee paid 
21.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/12]
30.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2004Fee for grant paid
13.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Request for further processing for:25.11.2003Request for further processing filed
25.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.12.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
PT08.05.2005
CY09.06.2005
LU09.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/26]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
CY09.06.2005
LU09.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/20]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
CY09.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/08]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/28]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0360766  (MARINO ANTONIO) [AD] 1-13 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 23; figure - *;
 [A]US2129082  (BYRER RALPH W) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]FR920155  (MUNCH) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 46 - page 2, line 9; figure - *;
 [AP]FR2773961  (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [AP] 1-13 * page 3, line 22 - page 8, line 21; figure - *;
 [A]US5836033  (BERGE HARALD [CZ])
ExaminationWO9716995
 US5628082
by applicantUS4277862
 US4288883
 US5628082
 EP0360766
 WO9615696
 WO9818364
 WO9827846