Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099062

EP1099062 - DUAL-CHAMBER SUPPORT BEARING WITH HYDRAULIC DAMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG
Postfach 1220
49441 Lemförde / DE
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / ERSOY, Metin
Eichenweg 1 a
D-65396 Walluf / DE
02 / KRAMER, Klaus
Wiesenthal 12
D-49434 Neuenkirchen / DE
 [2001/20]
Application number, filing date00945577.530.05.2000
[2001/20]
WO2000DE01729
Priority number, dateDE199912510501.06.1999         Original published format: DE 19925105
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0073677
Date:07.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099062
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099062
Date:14.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/26
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/03]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ZWEIKAMMERSTÜTZLAGER MIT HYDRAULISCHER DÄMPFUNG[2001/20]
English:DUAL-CHAMBER SUPPORT BEARING WITH HYDRAULIC DAMPING[2001/20]
French:SUPPORT DE MOTEUR A DEUX CHAMBRES A AMORTISSEMENT HYDRAULIQUE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2001National basic fee paid 
17.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
18.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2003Fee for grant paid
20.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9617184  (AVON CLEVITE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * figures 6,8 * * page 7, line 6 - line 29 * * page 18, line 23 - page 20, line 20 *;
 [PA]EP0952371  (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE]) [PA] 1,4 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [PA]DE19812837  (MANNESMANN BOGE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,4 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE4322958  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE])
by applicantDE4322958
 JPS62270841