Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1207087

EP1207087 - COOLANT FOR AIR-BAG GAS GENERATOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1 Teppo-cho, Sakai-ku
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP
For all designated states
CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68, Kami-shioda, Aza, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 458-8505 / JP
For all designated states
Kansai Wire Netting Co. Ltd.
7-8, Inari 2 chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 556-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1 Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP
For all designated states
CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68, Kami-shioda, Aza, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 458-8505 / JP
For all designated states
Kansai Wire Netting Co. Ltd.
7-8, Inari 2 chome, Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0023 / JP
Former [2002/21]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8501 / JP
For all designated states
CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68, Kami-shioda, Aza, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 458-8505 / JP
For all designated states
Kansai Wire Netting Co. Ltd.
7-8, Inari 2 chome, Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUNAGA, Katsuaki
694-1, Akeda, Sigoucho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-0245 / JP
02 / YAGI, Satoshi
940-2, Kurosaki, Mitsucho
Ibo-gun, Hyogo 671-1301 / JP
03 / OTA, Mitsunori
Rabidensu Denjiyama 404, 1-23, Denji, Narumicho
Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0844 / JP
04 / CHIBA, Masahiro
1-6-17, Ajirominami
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577-0842 / JP
 [2002/21]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00946291.212.07.2000
[2002/21]
WO2000JP04672
Priority number, dateJP1999020017914.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20017999
[2002/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0105632
Date:25.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1207087
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001
[2002/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1207087
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/26, B01D46/24
[2002/45]
Former International [2002/21]B60R21/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2002/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLMITTEL FÜR EINEN AIRBAGGASGENERATOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2002/21]
English:COOLANT FOR AIR-BAG GAS GENERATOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR[2002/21]
French:REFRIGERANT POUR GENERATEUR DE GAZ D'AIRBAG ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT[2002/21]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2002Translation filed 
14.01.2002National basic fee paid 
14.01.2002Search fee paid 
14.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/21]
10.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2004Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2004Fee for grant paid
23.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB12.07.2005
[2006/35]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0876943  (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1,6-8,14,16,17 * abstract * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 33 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 20 * * column 19, line 31 - column 21, line 8 * [A] 2-5,9-13,15;
 [XA]JPH10119705
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10119705 A 19980512 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,7,8,13,14 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6,11,12,15
International search[X]JPH1120598  (DAICEL CHEM);
 [Y]JPH10315897  (DAICEL CHEM)