Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1123944

EP1123944 - PARTIAL CONDENSATE OF GLYCIDYL ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING ALKOXYSILANE, SILANE-MODIFIED RESIN, COMPOSITIONS THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/33]GLYCIDYL ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING PARTIAL ALKOXYSILANE CONDENSATE, SILANE-MODIFIED RESIN, COMPOSITIONS OF THESE, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE
[2009/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARAKAWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3-7 Hiranomachi, 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0046 / JP
[2009/09]
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
Arakawa Chemical Industries, Ltd.
3-7 Hiranomachi, 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP
Former [2001/33]For all designated states
ARAKAWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3-7, Hiranomachi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / GODA, Hideki
8-190, Hiradani, Osumi
Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0343 / JP
02 / TAKEDA, Shoji
5-1-2, Higashikonoike-cho
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 578-0973 / JP
03 / HIGASHINO, Tetsuji
1-2-17-502, Uehonmachi, Tennoji-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 543-0001 / JP
 [2001/33]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/33]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date00946328.214.07.2000
[2001/33]
WO2000JP04737
Priority number, dateJP1999020144615.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20144699
JP1999022595910.08.1999         Original published format: JP 22595999
JP2000005555201.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000055552
JP2000010863110.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000108631
JP2000011558817.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000115588
[2001/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0105862
Date:25.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1123944
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001
[2001/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1123944
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/02, C08G77/38, C08G59/62, C08L83/06, C08G73/10, C08G8/28, C08L63/00, C08L79/08
[2002/42]
Former International [2001/33]C08G59/02, C08G77/38, C08G59/62, C08L83/06, C08G73/10, C08G8/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/33]
TitleGerman:ENTHALTEND GLYCIDYLETHERGRUPPE PARTIELLES ALKOXYSILAN-KONDENSAT, SILANMODIFIZIERTES HARZ, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DARAUS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2009/09]
English:PARTIAL CONDENSATE OF GLYCIDYL ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING ALKOXYSILANE, SILANE-MODIFIED RESIN, COMPOSITIONS THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREOF[2009/09]
French:CONDENSAT PARTIEL, D'ALKOXYSILANE CONTENANT DES GROUPEMENTS GLYCIDYL ETHER, RESINE MODIFIEE AU SILANE, COMPOSITIONS A PARTIR DE CEUX-CI ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CEUX-CI[2009/09]
Former [2001/33]GLYCIDYLETHERGRUPPE ENTHALTENDES PARTIELLES ALKOXYSILAN-KONDENSAT, SILANMODIFIZIERTES HARZ, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DARAUS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG
Former [2001/33]GLYCIDYL ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING PARTIAL ALKOXYSILANE CONDENSATE, SILANE-MODIFIED RESIN, COMPOSITIONS OF THESE, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE
Former [2001/33]CONDENSAT D'ALKOXYSILANE PARTIEL CONTENANT UN GROUPE GLYCIDYL ETHER, RESINE MODIFIEE AU SILANE, COMPOSITIONS DE CES DERNIERS ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CES DERNIERS
Entry into regional phase27.03.2001Translation filed 
29.03.2001National basic fee paid 
29.03.2001Search fee paid 
29.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
09.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2008Fee for grant paid
30.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IE14.07.2009
LU14.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/21]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IE14.07.2009
LU14.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/47]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IE14.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/35]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IE14.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/21]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
CH31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/11]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
MC31.07.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1114834  (ARAKAWA CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 1-9,18-25 * See in particular page 3 line 1; page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 4; claims 1-10 *;
 [E]EP1086972  (ARAKAWA CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 1-9,18-25 * See in particular page 3 line 28; page 3, line 6 - line 32; claims 1-17 *;
 [Y]US5492981  (HOEHN KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-25 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 13; claims 1-3 *;
 [X]JPS57142992  ;
 [Y]JPH1054979  ;
 [A]EP0620242  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-25 * page 5, line 26 - line 47 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821202), vol. 006, no. 244, Database accession no. (C - 138), & JP57142992 A 19820903 (TOUSHIBA SILICONE KK) [X] 1-25 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 18, Database accession no. 1998-202702, XP002210786 & JPH1054979 A 19980224 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 1-25 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH03287627  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JPH04363316  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]US5206328  (OKAMURA YOSHIO [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0572179  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]);
 [A]US5700581  (SACHDEV KRISHNA G [US], et al)
by applicantEP0620242
 US5492981
 JPS57142992
 JPH1054979
 JPH03287627
 EP1114834
 EP1086972