Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1196939

EP1196939 - OBJECT INSPECTION AND/OR MODIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Nanotechnology, LLC
1119 Park Hill Road
Berkeley, CA 94708 / US
[2002/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KLEY, Victor, B.
1119 Park Hill Road
Berkeley, CA 94708 / US
 [2002/16]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00946927.130.06.2000
[2002/16]
WO2000US18041
Priority number, dateUS19990142178P01.07.1999         Original published format: US 142178 P
[2002/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0103157
Date:11.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1196939
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001
[2002/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/26, G12B21/20, B82B3/00, H01L21/00
[2002/38]
Former International [2002/16]H01J37/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG UND/ODER VERÄNDERUNGSOBJEKT[2002/16]
English:OBJECT INSPECTION AND/OR MODIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2002/16]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE SERVANT A INSPECTER ET/OU MODIFIER UN OBJET[2002/16]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2002National basic fee paid 
29.01.2002Search fee paid 
29.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
31.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/25]
06.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2004
Request for further processing for:11.04.2005Request for further processing filed
11.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.04.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200203   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2002
30.06.201213   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5418363  (ELINGS VIRGIL B [US], et al) [AD] 1,9,17 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5495109  (LINDSAY STUART M [US], et al) [A] * column 4, line 13 - line 23 *;
 [A]US5414260  (TAKIMOTO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4954704  (ELINGS VIRGIL B [US], et al) [A] * figure 6; claim 1 *;
 [X]US5249077  (LARONGA VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 25,27 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US5081390  (ELINGS VIRGIL B [US]) [A] 30-35 * column 5, line 14 - line 22; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5210410  (BARRETT ROBERT [CA]) [A] * column 5, line 14 - line 30; figure 4 *
International search[A]US5408094  (KAJIMURA HIROSHI [JP]);
 [A]US5756997  (KLEY VICTOR B [US])