blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1200179

EP1200179 - CHARGED FILTRATION MEMBRANES AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/21]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VAN REIS, Robert, D.
421 Hillcrest Way
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Kiddle, Simon John, et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00947589.821.07.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000US19964
Priority number, dateUS19990146558P30.07.1999         Original published format: US 146558 P
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0108792
Date:08.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1200179
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1200179
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1200179
Date:21.02.2007
[2007/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D69/12, B01D71/10
[2002/18]
CPC:
B01D67/0093 (EP); B01D67/00933 (US); B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US); B01D71/10 (EP,US); B01D71/22 (EP,US);
C07K1/34 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2007/07]
Former [2002/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GELADENE FILTRATIONMEMBRANEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2002/18]
English:CHARGED FILTRATION MEMBRANES AND USES THEREFOR[2002/18]
French:MEMBRANES DE FILTRATION CHARGEES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIEES[2002/18]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2002National basic fee paid 
01.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
26.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2006Fee for grant paid
23.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Request for further processing for:15.03.2005Request for further processing filed
15.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.05.2006
FI24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
GR25.08.2006
PT24.10.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/19]FI24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
GR25.08.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/35]FI24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/12]FI24.05.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2006/51]FI24.05.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1504261  (ALIGENA AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4604204  (LINDER CHARLES [IL], et al) [A] 1-11* claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.