Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255526

EP1255526 - IMPROVED LOW-COST DENTIFRICE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YUE, Jiang
7585 Lakota Springs Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
02 / MITRA, Shekhar
7305 Demar Road
Cincinnati 45243 Ohio / US
03 / CHENG, Sonia
D3-404, Yayiju, Dongpu
Guangzhou 510660 / CN
04 / YANG, Lijiang, Room 604, 80 Puhui Street
Guangzhou Economic & Tech. Dev. District
Guangzhou 510730 / CN
 [2003/01]
Former [2002/46]01 / YUE, Jiang
7585 Lakota Springs Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
02 / MITRA, Shekhar
White Swan Hotel, Apartment 352
Guangzhou 510133 / CN
03 / CHENG, Sonia
D3-404, Yayiju, Dongpu
Guangzhou 510660 / CN
04 / YANG, Lijiang, Room 604, 80 Puhui Street
Guangzhou Economic & Tech. Dev. District
Guangzhou 510730 / CN
Representative(s)Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane, Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2002/46]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date00948753.918.07.2000
[2002/46]
WO2000US19580
Priority number, dateWO2000US0186627.01.2000         Original published format: PCT/US00/01866
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154657
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255526
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/16, A61K7/18
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE KOSTENGÜNSTIGE ZAHNPASTA[2002/46]
English:IMPROVED LOW-COST DENTIFRICE COMPOSITION[2002/46]
French:COMPOSITION DE DENTIFRICE AMELIOREE ET ECONOMIQUE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2002National basic fee paid 
26.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/47]
18.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XP]US6045780  (BIXLER HARRIS J [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * column W *;
 [X]WO9963959  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5320830  (LUKACOVIC MICHAEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column W *;
 [X]EP0331415  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4421527  (WASON SATISH K [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column W *;
 [X]US5089255  (GAFFAR ABDUL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * column W *